Ritter v. E-Z Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Debra Ritter
Defendant: E-Z Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00043
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/11/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1340042 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by E-Z Stores, Inc. (Hillis, R.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E-Z Stores, Inc. (Hillis, R.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by R. Tom Hillis on behalf of E-Z Stores, Inc. (Hillis, R.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 2/18/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number CJ-2019-244 by E-Z Stores, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by E-Z Stores, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against E-Z Stores, Inc. by Debra Ritter (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritter v. E-Z Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Z Stores, Inc.
Represented By: R. Tom Hillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ritter
Represented By: Phil Votaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?