Muskogee, City of v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Muskogee, City of
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., SpecGx, LLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Sandoz, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Indivior, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Allergan, PLC, Indivior, PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Wal-Mart, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Watson Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, SAJ Distributors, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00082
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 ***Remark: Transferred case has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45162. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFIED ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2804) and transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paul J. Cosgrove on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Cosgrove, Paul)
April 20, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey D. Geoppinger on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (MDL No. 2804) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton granting #33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Paul J. Cosgrove and Jeffrey D. Geoppinger for Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2020 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Paul J. Cosgrove, Jeffrey D. Geoppinger to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1358883) by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 5/1/2020(Hill, Theresa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Pursuant to the minute order previously entered this date (Re: 30 Minute Order) and as a supplement thereto, this case was reassigned to United States District Judge Joe Heaton of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b).(lal, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Petition ( #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. and Walmart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. shall move, answer, object or otherwise respond to plaintiff's petition within 60 days following the final determination of removal of this action to federal court or transfer to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No. CV 17-2804, whichever is later. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the court, this case is hereby reassigned to District Judge Joe Heaton. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-82-JH.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Petition (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Wal-Mart, Inc. Responses due by 4/22/2020(Ottaway, Larry) Modified on 4/8/2020 to edit event and add link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
April 8, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry D. Ottaway on behalf of Wal-Mart, Inc. (Ottaway, Larry)
April 8, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Wal-Mart, Inc. (Fischer, Amy)
April 8, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordyn Cartmell on behalf of Wal-Mart, Inc. (Cartmell, Jordyn)
April 8, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 20-82-RAW.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Theresa N. Hill on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Hill, Theresa)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Docket Entry #18 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within 60 days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendant Smith Drug Co.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and for Relief Under LCvR 83.3(c)(Docket Entry #21 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant Smith Drug Co. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within 45 days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. Additionally, Colin D. Dougherty is authorized to represent Defendant in this matter in accordance with EDOK LCvR 83.3(c).(adw, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and for Relief Under LCVR 83.3(c) by Smith Drug Company Responses due by 4/9/2020(Dougherty, Colin) Modified on 3/27/2020 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 26, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JM Smith Corporation for Smith Drug Company (Dougherty, Colin) Modified on 3/27/2020: added Corporate Parent (nm, Deputy Clerk).
March 26, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Colin D. Dougherty on behalf of Smith Drug Company (Dougherty, Colin)
March 26, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition under Rule 12 by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. Responses due by 4/9/2020(Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 3/27/2020 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 26, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
March 26, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven E. Holden on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Holden, Steven)
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #5 Notice of Removal ) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Moving Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Docket Entry #10 ) is hereby GRANTED. The moving Defendants identified in the Motion as Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. (incorrectly named as a separate entity in the Complaint); Cephalon, Inc.: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC; Sandoz Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; SpecGx LLC; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; and West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. n/k/a Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (incorrectly named as West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. d/b/a Hikma) with Defendants Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, a corporation organized under the laws of the United Kingdom, Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc, an Irish corporation, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., an Israeli company joining in the Motion shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within 45 days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Re: #5 Notice of Removal) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 4/7/2020(Zschiesche, Ray) Modified on 3/25/2020 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
March 20, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/20/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1351961 (Re: #5 Notice of Removal ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/27/2020) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Removal from Muskogee County District Court, case number 20-CJ-78 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis, PLC, Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Indivior, Inc., Indivior, PLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Sandoz, Inc., Smith Drug Company, SpecGx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. by Muskogee, City of (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muskogee, City of v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx, LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Geoppinger
Represented By: Theresa N. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Lori G. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Jordyn Cartmell
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: John Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Alexander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Kevin P. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muskogee, City of
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?