Muskogee County Board of County Commissioners v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Muskogee County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., SpecGx, LLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Indivior, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Allergan, PLC, Indivior, PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, PLC, Sandoz, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Watson Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, SAJ Distributors, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00101
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 ***Remark: Transferred case opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45155, filed 04/28/2020 (MDL 2804) (Re: #32 Transferring Case, Order, #31 Order ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-149)(MDL 2804) by Court Clerk transferring case ND/OH. (case terminated)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 31 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey D. Geoppinger on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2020 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paul J. Cosgrove on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Cosgrove, Paul)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing filed by Theresa N. Hill (Docket Entry #27 ) is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Paul J. Cosgrove and Jeffrey D. Geoppinger are admitted to this District for the sole and limited purpose of representing Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC in this action. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Paul J. Cosgrove, Jeffrey D. Geoppinger to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1358876) by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 5/1/2020(Hill, Theresa)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Docket Entry #25 ) is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co. shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Petition forty-five (45) days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. The Motion for Relief Under LCvR 83.3 (c) contained in the same pleading is hereby DENIED, as no explanation for the need for relief is contained in the body of the Motion and the filing counsel is local.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Responses due by 4/29/2020(Holden, Steven)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendant Smith Drug Co.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and for Relief Under LCvR 83.3(c)(Docket Entry #22 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant Smith Drug Co. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within 45 days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later. Additionally, John J. Haggerty is authorized to represent Defendant in this matter in accordance with EDOK LCvR 83.3(c).(adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Docket Entry #19 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Petition sixty (60) days following 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Smith Drug Company Responses due by 4/27/2020(Haggerty, John)
April 13, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith Drug Company (Haggerty, John) Modified on 4/14/2020: edit text (nm, Deputy Clerk).
April 13, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John J. Haggerty on behalf of Smith Drug Company (Haggerty, John)
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. Responses due by 4/27/2020(Campbell, Stuart)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Moving Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Docket Entry #14 ) is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; SpecGx LLC; Indivior Inc.; Sandoz Inc.; Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. n/k/a Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.; Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC.; and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition forty-five (45) days after the later of: 1) A decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) This Court's ruling on any motion to remand. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart)
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
April 13, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 4/27/2020(Zschiesche, Ray)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven E. Holden on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Holden, Steven)
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Theresa N. Hill on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Hill, Theresa)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
April 7, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 4/7/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1356326 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Defendants to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Defendants' failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to parties. (Filing Fee due by 4/14/2020)(nm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/7/2020 to attach consent forms and regenerated NEF (nm, Deputy Clerk).
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Muskogee County District Court, case number CJ-20-116 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(nm, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2020 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis, PLC, Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Indivior, Inc., Indivior, PLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Sandoz, Inc., Smith Drug Company, SpecGx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. by Muskogee County Board of County Commissioners (nm, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muskogee County Board of County Commissioners v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx, LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Geoppinger
Represented By: Theresa N. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC
Represented By: Kevin P. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Lori G. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Steven E. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: John Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Alexander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Kevin P. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle D. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muskogee County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?