Short v. McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners
Plaintiff: Anthony Bruce Short
Defendant: McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 6:2020cv00261
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting #14 Motion to Withdraw Documents(s). Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk against McCurtain County, Oklahoma, a political subdivision sued in the name of The Board of County Commissioners of McCurtain County, Oklahoma #10 is hereby withdrawn. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw Document (Re: #10 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk) by Anthony Bruce Short Responses due by 10/13/2020(Roberts, Brandon)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephen L. Geries on behalf of McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners (Geries, Stephen)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners (Carr, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael L. Carr on behalf of McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners (Carr, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against McCurtain County, Oklahoma, a political subdivision sued in the name of The Board of County Commissioners of McCurtain County, Oklahoma by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/28/2020(Roberts, Brandon)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Amended CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #4 Summons Issued ) by Anthony Bruce Short (Hurst, Amber)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners - served on 8/13/20 by Anthony Bruce Short (Roberts, Brandon) Modified on 9/4/2020 to add service date (dma, Deputy Clerk).
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Hammons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hammons, Mark)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Douglas Roberts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roberts, Brandon)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amber L. Hurst on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hurst, Amber)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/5/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1388220 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Anthony Bruce Short (Roberts, Brandon)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 8/10/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners by Anthony Bruce Short (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Anthony Bruce Short (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short v. McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bruce Short
Represented By: Brandon Douglas Roberts
Represented By: Mark Hammons
Represented By: Amber L. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Michael L. Carr
Represented By: Stephen L. Geries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?