Pierce v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Mark Pierce
Respondent: John Lilley Correctional Center, FNU Shields, FNU Anderson and FNU Williams
Case Number: 6:2020cv00284
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White : Defendant John Lilley Correctional Center is DISMISSED from this action. Plaintiff is directed to file within twenty-one (21) days an amended complaint on the Court's form as directed in this Opinion and Order.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: Granting #2 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/20/2020 in the amount of $65.61.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 ACCOUNT STATEMENT of Prisoner Trust Fund by Mark Pierce (acg, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder, Directing plaintiff to submit within fourteen (14) days a Statement of Institutional Accounts form for a six-month period completed by the appropriate facility official. Failure to submit a proper Statement of Institutional Accounts as directed will result in dismissal of this action. The Court Clerk is directed to send plaintiff and the trust fund officer at his facility copies of this minute order and of the court's Statement of Institutional Accounts form.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-20-284-RAW-SPS. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Oklahoma Western
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ~ The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation #5 and TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 8/19/2020. (dwl) [Transferred from okwd on 8/19/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by Mark Pierce (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Report and Recommendation, #2 Envelope)(knt) [Transferred from okwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps) [Transferred from okwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The undersigned recommends the transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2020. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/20/2020. (cps) [Transferred from okwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell.Signed by the direction of Honorable Bernard Jones on 7/17/20. (knt) [Transferred from okwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (knt) [Transferred from okwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt) [Transferred from okwd on 8/19/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Anderson, John Lilley Correctional Center, FNU Shields, FNU Williams filed by Mark Pierce. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt) [Transferred from okwd on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Lilley Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FNU Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FNU Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FNU Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?