Rogers v. Hudnall
Plaintiff: Marc Rogers
Defendant: Kristi Ann Hudnall
Case Number: 6:2020cv00285
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 20-285-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/19/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1393072 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Kristi Ann Hudnall (Carter, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 JURY DEMAND by Kristi Ann Hudnall (Carter, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian L. Carter on behalf of Kristi Ann Hudnall (Carter, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Oren Kuperman on behalf of Kristi Ann Hudnall (Kuperman, Steven)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bob L. Latham on behalf of Kristi Ann Hudnall (Latham, Bob)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 8/26/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number CJ-2020-098 by Kristi Ann Hudnall (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kristi Ann Hudnall (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 ANSWER to Amended Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Kristi Ann Hudnall (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Kristi Ann Hudnall by Marc Rogers (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Hudnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Ann Hudnall
Represented By: Bob L. Latham
Represented By: Brian L. Carter
Represented By: Steven Oren Kuperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Rogers
Represented By: Ryan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?