Jones v. Stilwell, City of et al
Plaintiff: Vonnie Jones Vonnie's Pawn, a sole proprietorship doing business as Vonnie's Pawn
Defendant: Stilwell, City of and Jean Ann Wright
Case Number: 6:2020cv00305
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Stilwell, City of, Jean Ann Wright (LeBlanc, Thomas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White, Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and hearings set before Magistrate Judge West are hereby stricken. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 20-305-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/23/2020 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed 10/1/2020 ( #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ) is granted. Accordingly, defendants City of Stilwell and Jean Ann Wright have until 10/15/2020 within which to file their answer or otherwise plead. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Defendants Responses due by 10/15/2020(LeBlanc, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas A. LeBlanc on behalf of All Defendants (LeBlanc, Thomas)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Mayor Jean Ann Wright - served on 9/9/20 by Vonnie Jones (Conrady, James) Modified on 9/23/2020 to add service date (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Vonnie Jones - Served on 9/9/2020 to City of Stilwell by Vonnie Jones (Conrady, James)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jean Ann Wright (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to City of Stilwell (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James A. Conrady on behalf of Vonnie Jones (Conrady, James)
September 4, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/4/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1399470 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Vonnie Jones (Donahoe, Laurence)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/11/2020) (Re: #2 Complaint ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Stilwell, Jean Ann Wright by Vonnie Jones (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Vonnie Jones (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Stilwell, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stilwell, City of
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Ann Wright
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonnie Jones Vonnie's Pawn, a sole proprietorship doing business as Vonnie's Pawn
Represented By: Laurence K. Donahoe
Represented By: James A. Conrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?