Wolfe v. Big Iron Auction Company
Plaintiff: Michael E. Wolfe
Defendant: Big Iron Auction Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv00325
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael E. Wolfe (Hammons, Mark)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrice Ott on behalf of Big Iron Auction Company (Ott, Patrice) Modified on 11/6/2020 to edit event and text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by J. Miles McFadden on behalf of Patrice D. Ott (Docket Entry #15 ) is hereby GRANTED. Ms. Ott is admitted to practice in this District for the limited and sole purpose of representing Defendant in this action. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Patrice D. Ott to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1421231) by Big Iron Auction Company (With attachments) Responses due by 11/16/2020(McFadden, J.)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/23/2020 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Big Iron Auction Company (McFadden, J.)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Withdraw Its Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry #11 ) is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and accompanying brief (Docket Entry #9 and #10 ) are hereby deemed WITHDRAWN. Further, Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than NOVEMBER 2, 2020.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Withdraw Document (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #10 Brief in Support of Motion) by Big Iron Auction Company (With attachments) Responses due by 10/30/2020(McFadden, J.)
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Big Iron Auction Company ; (With attachments)(McFadden, J.)
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Big Iron Auction Company [NOTE: Attorney J. Miles McFadden added to party Big Iron Auction Company(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 10/26/2020(McFadden, J.) Modified on 10/19/2020 to terminate/withdraw motion (adw, Deputy Clerk).
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Douglas Roberts on behalf of Michael E. Wolfe (Roberts, Brandon)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amber L. Hurst on behalf of Michael E. Wolfe (Hurst, Amber)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Hammons on behalf of Michael E. Wolfe (Hammons, Mark)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Big Iron Auction Company - Served on 9/21/2020. by Michael E. Wolfe (Hammons, Mark)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Big Iron Auction Company (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/18/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1405403 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Michael E. Wolfe (Hammons, Mark)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/25/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Big Iron Auction Company by Michael E. Wolfe (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael E. Wolfe (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe v. Big Iron Auction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Wolfe
Represented By: Mark Hammons
Represented By: Brandon Douglas Roberts
Represented By: Amber L. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Iron Auction Company
Represented By: Patrice D. Ott
Represented By: J. Miles McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?