Greer v. Classic Country Land, LLC
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Greer and Jeffry Greer
Defendant: Classic Country Land, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00343
Filed: October 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Jeffry Greer (Lawler, Travis)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Travis Lawler on behalf of Jeffry Greer (Lawler, Travis)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White inviting plaintiff if he desires to file an amended complaint providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate defendant's claims of insufficiency no later than 10/30/2020(lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Classic Country Land, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 10/23/2020(Spencer, Timothy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emalie L. Rott on behalf of Classic Country Land, LLC (Rott, Emalie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Classic Country Land, LLC (Spencer, Timothy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy L. Spencer on behalf of Classic Country Land, LLC (Spencer, Timothy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason A. McVicker on behalf of Classic Country Land, LLC (McVicker, Jason)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by Classic Country Land, LLC (Spencer, Timothy)
October 5, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/5/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1410721 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Classic Country Land, LLC (Spencer, Timothy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 10/13/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Okfuskee County District Court, case number CJ-2020-030 by Classic Country Land, LLC (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Classic Country Land, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Classic Country Land, LLC by Jeffrey Greer (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Classic Country Land, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Country Land, LLC
Represented By: Timothy L. Spencer
Represented By: Jason A. McVicker
Represented By: Emalie L. Rott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffry Greer
Represented By: Travis Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?