Pettigrew v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: John Pettigrew
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 6:2020cv00346
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra Amrhein on behalf of United States Department of Health and Human Services (Amrhein, Alexandra)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Emily Goldstein on behalf of United States Department of Health and Human Services (Goldstein, Rachel)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : At the direction of the court, this case is hereby reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-346-JFH.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States Department of Health and Human Services (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 10/13/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States Department of Health and Human Services by John Pettigrew (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by John Pettigrew (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/6/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1411800 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by John Pettigrew (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettigrew v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Alexandra Amrhein
Represented By: Rachel Emily Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pettigrew
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?