American Humanist Association, Inc. et al v. Adair School District, et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, American Humanist Association, Inc., John Doe, Adair School District No. 22 and Jill Doe
Defendant: Lori Means, Patricia Frederick, Rickey Christie, Chad Harp and Maryetta Public Schools
Case Number: 6:2020cv00383
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III finding good cause to delay the entry of Rule 16 Scheduling Order, due to the pending Motion to Dismiss filed in this case on 12/11/2020 (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss ) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Responses are due by 1/11/2021 (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss ) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Monica L. Miller for Plaintiffs, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Admission is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims of the American Humanist Association, Inc. with Combined Brief in Support) by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/29/2020(Branum, James)
December 14, 2020 Filing 29 ***Remark: Received DVD (original and one copy) of video exhibits relating to #22 Reply to Response to Motion. (Disc contains Exhibits 15-17) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Defendants (Hegenbart, Frederick)
December 11, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims of the American Humanist Association, Inc. with Combined Brief in Support by All Defendants Responses due by 12/28/2020(Hegenbart, Frederick)
December 9, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION for Protective Order) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments)(Branum, James)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III GRANTING #20 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Reply is due by 12/17/2020. (Re: #9 MOTION for Protective Order) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: #9 MOTION for Protective Order) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 12/14/2020(Branum, James)
November 19, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION for Protective Order) by All Defendants (Hegenbart, Frederick)
November 17, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (Re: #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer). Accordingly, defendants Elementary School District No. 22 of Adair County, Oklahoma, a/k/a Maryetta Public Schools, Lori Means, Chad Harp, Patricia Frederick, and Rickey Christie have until 12/14/2020 to file their answer or otherwise plead. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Defendants. Responses due by 12/1/2020 (Hegenbart, Frederick) Modified on 11/19/2020 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frederick J. Hegenbart on behalf of All Defendants (Hegenbart, Frederick)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: All Defendants. by Jill Doe, John Doe(individually), Jane Doe(individually), Jane Doe(as parent and next friend of Jill Doe), American Humanist Association, Inc., John Doe(as parent and next friend of Jill Doe) (Branum, James)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Lori Means (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Adair School District No. 22 (Maryetta Public Schools) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Chad Harp (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patricia Frederick (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Rickey Christie (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 11/12/2020(Branum, James)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Monica L. Miller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1419293) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 11/12/2020(Branum, James)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Plaintiff John Doe (Supplemental) (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Plaintiffs (Branum, James)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Plaintiff John Doe (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Plaintiffs (Branum, James)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Plaintiff Jane Doe (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Plaintiffs (Branum, James)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Plaintiff Jill Doe (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Plaintiffs (Branum, James)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 11/4/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/28/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1418854 (Re: #2 Complaint,, ) by American Humanist Association, Inc., Jane Doe(individually), Jane Doe(as parent and next friend of Jill Doe), Jill Doe, John Doe(individually), John Doe(as parent and next friend of Jill Doe) (Branum, James)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Rickey Christie(in his official capacity as Physical Education Teacher at Maryetta Public School and individually), Patricia Frederick(individually and in her official capacity as Prekindergarten Teacher at Maryetta Public School), Chad Harp(in his official capacity as Principal of Maryetta Public School and individually), Adair School District No. 22, Lori Means(in her official capacity as Superintendent of Elementary School District No. 22 of Adair County, Oklahoma and individually) by Jill Doe, Jane Doe(individually and as parent and next friend of Jill Doe), American Humanist Association, Inc., John Doe(individually and as parent and next friend of Jill Doe) (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/28/2020 (jcb, Deputy Clerk).
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by American Humanist Association, Inc., Jane Doe(individually and as parent and next friend of Jill Doe), Jill Doe, John Doe(individually and as parent and next friend of Jill Doe) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Humanist Association, Inc. et al v. Adair School District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Means
Represented By: Frederick J. Hegenbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Frederick
Represented By: Frederick J. Hegenbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey Christie
Represented By: Frederick J. Hegenbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Harp
Represented By: Frederick J. Hegenbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryetta Public Schools
Represented By: Frederick J. Hegenbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: James M. Branum
Represented By: Monica L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Humanist Association, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Branum
Represented By: Monica L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: James M. Branum
Represented By: Monica L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adair School District No. 22
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Doe
Represented By: James M. Branum
Represented By: Monica L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?