Rafati v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Petitioner: Rani K. Rafati
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf and William P. Barr
Case Number: 6:2020cv00411
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFIED MAIL Return Receipt Received - William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States #1 Petition and #2 Order (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFIED MAIL Return Receipt Received - U. S. Attorney #1 Petition and #2 Order (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III directing the Respondents to answer the Petition and directing the Clerk to send copies of the Petition and this Order to United States Attorney's Office, William Barr, Chad Wolf, and the ICE Dallas Field Office. The Clerk's Office shall add William Barr, Attorney General of the United States, and Chad Wolf, acting Secretary of Homeland Security as party respondents (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241). (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/16/2020 in the amount of $5, receipt number 018610 (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 ) by Rani K. Rafati (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 by Rani K. Rafati (With attachments)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rafati v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rani K. Rafati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?