Williamson v. Kool Kar Automotive, LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Williamson
Defendant: Kool Kar Automotive, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00418
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Mark Williamson by Kool Kar Automotive, LLC (Wesberry, Leslie) Modified on 12/31/2020 to edit party (dma, Deputy Clerk).
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leslie Wesberry, Jr on behalf of Kool Kar Automotive, LLC (Wesberry, Leslie)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kool Kar Automotive, LLC (Burrage, David)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Kool Kar Automotive, LLC (Burrage, David)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Burrage on behalf of All Defendants (Burrage, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kool Kar Automotive, LLC - Served on 12/5/2020. by Mark Williamson (Irwin, Jonathan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kool Kar Automotive, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Woodrow K. Glass on behalf of Mark Williamson (Glass, Woodrow)
November 19, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/19/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1428352 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Mark Williamson (sms, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 11/25/2020)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kool Kar Automotive, LLC by Mark Williamson (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Mark Williamson (kdc, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Kool Kar Automotive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Williamson
Represented By: Jonathan M. Irwin
Represented By: Woodrow K. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kool Kar Automotive, LLC
Represented By: Leslie Wesberry, Jr.
Represented By: David Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?