Green v. Foster and Monroe LLC
Plaintiff: Maryann Green
Defendant: Foster and Monroe LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00441
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant has until 2/8/2021 within which to file its Answer or otherwise responsive pleading. Additionally, Plaintiff is direct to provide a copy of this Order to Defendant and their Counsel. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by Maryann Green (With attachments) Responses due by 2/1/2021(Parr, James)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Foster and Monroe LLC - Served on 12/9/2020. by Maryann Green (Parr, James)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elaine M. Dowling on behalf of Maryann Green (Dowling, Elaine)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Foster and Monroe LLC (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/2/2020 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1432328 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Maryann Green (Parr, James)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 12/8/2020)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Foster and Monroe LLC by Maryann Green (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Maryann Green (kdc, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Foster and Monroe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster and Monroe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Green
Represented By: Elaine M. Dowling
Represented By: James J Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?