Dodds, Jr. v. Nunn
Petitioner: Thomas C. Dodds, Jr. and Thomas Carl Dodds, Jr.
Respondent: Scott Nunn
Case Number: 6:2020cv00470
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE to the court (Re: #7 MOTION to Stay ) by Thomas Carl Dodds, Jr. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Thomas Carl Dodds, Jr. ;(acg, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss) by Scott Nunn (With attachments)(Lockett, Joshua)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition as Unexhausted by Scott Nunn Responses due by 1/28/2021(Lockett, Joshua)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Thomas Carl Dodds, Jr. (With attachments) Responses due by 1/25/2021(acg, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORRECTION ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: This Order is entered to correct Petitioner's name in the caption of the previous Order #4 , which incorrectly showed Petitioner's name as Thomas C. Dobbs, Jr. (Re: #4 Order) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joshua L. Lockett on behalf of Scott Nunn (Lockett, Joshua)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West, directing Respondent to show cause why the writ should not issue and file a response to the petition. Responses due by 1/15/2021. (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/15/2020 in the amount of $5, receipt number 18691 (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ). (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-20-470-RAW-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: Upon review of the file in this case, the Court finds that the petitioner has not submitted a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or paid the $5.00 filing fee. The petitioner is directed to submit a properly executed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with original signature and have the Trust Fund Officer at his/her facility complete (with an original signature) the Required Certification (Page 3) and provide a current 6-month financial accounting statement and return the completed motion to the Office of the Clerk or pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 20 days or by 1/4/21. The Clerk is directed to provide the plaintiff with a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form and an instruction sheet. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Thomas Carl Dodds, Jr. (acg, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodds, Jr. v. Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas C. Dodds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Carl Dodds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Nunn
Represented By: Joshua L. Lockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?