Brown v. Solara Hospital
Plaintiff: Amber Brown
Defendant: Solara Hospital doing business as Cornerstone Hospital of Oklahoma - Muskogee
Case Number: 6:2020cv00481
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay ) by Amber Brown ;(Hall, Melvin)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lindsay N. Kistler on behalf of Solara Hospital (Kistler, Lindsay)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Solara Hospital (With attachments) Responses due by 2/4/2021(Turner, Elaine)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elaine R. Turner on behalf of Solara Hospital (Turner, Elaine)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Solara Hospital - Served on 12/31/2020. by Amber Brown (Hall, Melvin)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Solara Hospital (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Melvin C. Hall on behalf of Amber Brown (Hall, Melvin)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 12/29/2020)(kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Solara Hospital by Amber Brown (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Amber Brown (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/22/2020 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1440337 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Amber Brown (Hall, Melvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Solara Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Brown
Represented By: Melvin C. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solara Hospital doing business as Cornerstone Hospital of Oklahoma - Muskogee
Represented By: Lindsay N. Kistler
Represented By: Elaine R. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?