Crampton v. Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Rita Crampton
Defendant: Does 1-10, Aboutanaa El Habit, Chris Morris, Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners and Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Case Number: 6:2021cv00053
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Oklahoma Department of Corrections - Served on 4/12/2021. by Rita Crampton (Smolen, Donald)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners - Served on 4/12/2021. by Rita Crampton (Smolen, Donald)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Oklahoma Department of Corrections. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Chris Morris. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Aboutanaa El Habit. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 3/1/2021). (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Aboutanaa El Habit, Chris Morris, Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners by Rita Crampton. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Rita Crampton. (kdc, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/22/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1461085 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Rita Crampton (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crampton v. Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aboutanaa El Habit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburg County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Crampton
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?