United States of America v. $83,400 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $83,400 in United States Currency
Claimant: Ku Kelvin Vue
Case Number: 6:2021cv00122
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #12 Answer to Complaint) by Ku Kelvin Vue (Konsure, M.)
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Ku Kelvin Vue (Konsure, M.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #10 Appearance - Attorney) by Ku Kelvin Vue (Reid, Josh)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Josh Reid on behalf of Ku Kelvin Vue (Reid, Josh)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #7 Appearance - Attorney, #8 Claim) by Ku Kelvin Vue (Konsure, M.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 CLAIM by Ku Kelvin Vue (Konsure, M.)
May 20, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by M. Todd Konsure on behalf of Ku Kelvin Vue (Konsure, M.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF PROPERTY IN REM by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West as to $83,400.00 In United States Currency. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR WARRANT FOR ARREST OF PROPERTY IN REM by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Compton, Clay)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against $83,400 in United States Currency by United States of America (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $83,400 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $83,400 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Clay A. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ku Kelvin Vue
Represented By: M. Todd Konsure
Represented By: Josh Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?