Meeks v. Department of Human Services
Plaintiff: David Meeks
Defendant: Department of Human Services
Case Number: 6:2021cv00227
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III: The Court has received #14 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Dismiss this action without prejudice, and notes that Defendant filed an #7 Answer to #2 Plaintiff's Petition for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief on August 11, 2021. Therefore, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff is directed to file a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III for disposition. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 21-227-JFH. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - This Court acknowledges the filing of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry #14 ). However, the parties have not all consented to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction. As a result, the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to a United States District Judge to address Plaintiff's unopposed Motion. The telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set in this case for September 30, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby STRICKEN.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by David Meeks Responses due by 10/8/2021(Hammons, John)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by M. Daniel Weitman (Docket Entry #12 ) is hereby GRANTED. Mr. Weitman is deemed WITHDRAWN from further representation of Defendant in this case. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Department of Human Services Responses due by 10/5/2021(Weitman, M.)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Department of Human Services ;(Weitman, M.)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by David Meeks Responses due by 9/2/2021(Hammons, John)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 9/30/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by Department of Human Services (Langford, John)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Department of Human Services (Langford, John)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by M. Daniel Weitman on behalf of Department of Human Services (Weitman, M.)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Department of Human Services (Langford, John)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John K.F. Langford on behalf of Department of Human Services (Langford, John)
August 9, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/9/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1539664 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Department of Human Services (Langford, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 8/11/2021) (jls, Deputy Clerk)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from McIntosh County District Court, case number 21-CV-82 by Department of Human Services (With attachments) (jls, Deputy Clerk)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Department of Human Services (jls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeks v. Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Meeks
Represented By: John Tyler Hammons
Represented By: Matthew R. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Services
Represented By: John K.F. Langford
Represented By: M. Daniel Weitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?