United States of America v. 85 Big Cats et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Big Cats, 85, Jaguar, 1 and Ring-Tailed Lemurs, 11
Case Number: 6:2021cv00228
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Returned executed as to 85 Big Cats, 1 jaguar, 3 cubs born to Big Cat "Priscilla", and 11 Ring-Tailed Lemurs. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Issued by Court Clerk as to 85 Big Cats, 1 jaguar, 3 cubs born to Big Cat "Priscilla", and 11 Ring-Tailed Lemurs. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III granting #5 Motion and Request for Issuance by the Clerk of Court of a Warrant of Arrest in rem by United States of America. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to issue Warrant of Arrest in Rem. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrin McCullough on behalf of United States of America (McCullough, Darrin)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION and Request for Issuance by the Clerk of Court of a Warrant of Arrest in rem by United States of America Responses due by 9/3/2021(Hollingsworth, Mary)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan S. Brandon on behalf of United States of America (Brandon, Susan)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jaguar, 1, Ring-Tailed Lemurs, 11, Big Cats, 85 by United States of America (With attachments) (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (tjm, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 85 Big Cats et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Hollingsworth
Represented By: Darrin McCullough
Represented By: Susan S. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Cats, 85
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar, 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ring-Tailed Lemurs, 11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?