Patterson v. United States Department of Health & Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Patterson
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services, Public Health Services, Indian Health Services, Okemah Creek Nation Community Hospital, Doug Davies, Oklahoma Heart Institute, Douglas Davies and Adrienne Taren
Case Number: 6:2021cv00247
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 31 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Klileen Hall on behalf of Douglas Davies (Hall, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Adrienne Taren - Served on 10/9/2021. by Brenda Patterson (Barkett, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #19 Amended Complaint) by Douglas Davies [NOTE: Attorney Kelsey Payton added to party Douglas Davies(pty:dft)]. (Payton, Kelsey)
October 12, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #19 Amended Complaint) by Oklahoma Heart Institute (Payton, Kelsey)
October 12, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Department of Health and Human Services - Served on 10/8/2021; Indian Health Services - Served on 10/8/2021; Okemah Creek Nation Community Hospital - Served on 10/8/2021. by Brenda Patterson (Barkett, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Douglas Davies - Served on 9/22/2021. by Brenda Patterson (Barkett, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Okemah Creek Nation Community Hospital - Served on 9/10/2021. by Brenda Patterson (Barkett, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Department of Health and Human Services - Served on 8/30/2021. by Brenda Patterson (Barkett, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Indian Health Services - Served on 8/30/2021. by Brenda Patterson (Barkett, Michael)
October 7, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Department of Health and Human Services - US Attorney (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Adrienne Taren (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Department of Health and Human Services - Attorney General (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Douglas Davies, Department of Health and Human Services, Indian Health Services, Okemah Creek Nation Community Hospital, Oklahoma Heart Institute (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Brenda Patterson (With attachments)(Barkett, Michael)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay and the #17 Motion to Strike Scheduling Conference, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan is hereby GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 10:30 a.m. is therefore STRICKEN and RESET for 11/12/2021 at 10:00 a.m. Parties are directed to filed Joint Status Report by 11/8/2021. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike Order Setting Scheduling Conference, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Until All Defendants Have Been Properly Served and Answered by Brenda Patterson Responses due by 10/20/2021(Barkett, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 10/15/2021 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form)(aaf, Chambers)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AHS Hillcrest Healthcare System, LLC, Corporate Parent AHS Oklahoma, LLC, Corporate Parent Ardent Legacy Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent AHP Health Partners, Inc., Corporate Parent Ardent Health Partners, LLC for Oklahoma Heart Institute) by Oklahoma Heart Institute (Hall, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kelsey Payton on behalf of Oklahoma Heart Institute (Payton, Kelsey)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Oklahoma Heart Institute (Hall, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Klileen Hall on behalf of Oklahoma Heart Institute (Hall, Elizabeth)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Okemah Creek Nation Community Hospital (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Public Health Services (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Indian Health Services - Area Director (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Indian Health Services (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Department of Health and Human Services (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Douglas Davies (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Oklahoma Heart Institute (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 8/26/2021) (jls, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael L. Barkett on behalf of Brenda Patterson (jls, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Douglas Davies, Department of Health and Human Services, Indian Health Services, Okemah Creek Nation Community Hospital, Oklahoma Heart Institute, Public Health Services by Brenda Patterson (jls, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brenda Patterson (jls, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/19/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1544628 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Brenda Patterson (Barkett, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. United States Department of Health & Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Patterson
Represented By: Michael L. Barkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okemah Creek Nation Community Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Heart Institute
Represented By: Elizabeth Klileen Hall
Represented By: Kelsey Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Davies
Represented By: Elizabeth Klileen Hall
Represented By: Kelsey Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Taren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?