Lyons v. City of Ada, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Natosha T. Lyons
Defendant: The City of Ada, Oklahoma, Tyler W. Pogue, Ryan C. Collier, Rich Eaker, Mercy Hospital Ada, Inc., Derek Goodson, Daniel Wilburn, Brian Ridgeway, Colton Stonesipher, Max Crook, Unknown Defendants 1-10 and Ada, City of
Case Number: 6:2021cv00297
Filed: October 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder granting #33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Jeanette Samuels for Plaintiff Natosha T. Lyons, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Ray Meely, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder granting #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Jarrett Adams for Plaintiff Natosha T. Lyons, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Peterson, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Attorney Jeanette Samuels to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1589748) by Natosha T. Lyons (With attachments) Responses due by 12/15/2021(Mattingly, Jack)
December 1, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney Jarrett Adams to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1589734) by Natosha T. Lyons (With attachments) Responses due by 12/15/2021(Mattingly, Jack)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 12/17/2021 at 10:15 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form)(aaf, Chambers)
November 17, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Max Crook, Derek Goodson, Mercy Hospital Ada, Inc., Brian Ridgeway, Colton Stonesipher, Daniel Wilburn (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 17, 2021 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy on behalf of Max Crook, Derek Goodson, Mercy Hospital Ada, Inc., Brian Ridgeway, Colton Stonesipher, Daniel Wilburn (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 15, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Tyler W. Pogue (Wood, Scott)
November 15, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Rich Eaker (Wood, Scott)
November 15, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Ryan C. Collier (Wood, Scott)
November 15, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Ada, City of (Wood, Scott)
November 11, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott B. Wood on behalf of Ada, City of, Ryan C. Collier, Rich Eaker, Tyler W. Pogue (Wood, Scott)
October 28, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Daniel Wilburn - Served on 10/22/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (Mattingly, Jack)
October 28, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brian Ridgeway - Served on 10/22/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (Mattingly, Jack)
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Derek Goodson - Served on 10/22/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (Mattingly, Jack)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Colton Stonesipher - Served on 10/22/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (Mattingly, Jack)
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Rich Eaker - Served on 10/22/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (Mattingly, Jack)
October 28, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Tyler W. Pogue - Served on 10/22/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (Mattingly, Jack)
October 28, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Max Crook - Served on 10/22/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (Mattingly, Jack)
October 28, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ryan C. Collier - Served on 10/22/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (Mattingly, Jack)
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Mercy Hospital Ada, Inc. - Served on 10/21/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (With attachments)(Mattingly, Jack)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ada, City of - Served on 10/22/2021. by Natosha T. Lyons (With attachments)(Mattingly, Jack)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brian Ridgeway (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ryan C. Collier (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (tjm, Deputy Clerk).
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Max Crook (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Daniel Wilburn (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Colton Stonesipher (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tyler W. Pogue (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Mercy Hospital Ada, Inc. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Derek Goodson (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Rich Eaker (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ada, City of (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 10/12/2021) (jls, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The City of Ada, Oklahoma, Ryan C. Collier, Max Crook, Rich Eaker, Derek Goodson, Mercy Hospital Ada, Inc., Tyler W. Pogue, Brian Ridgeway, Colton Stonesipher, Unknown Defendants 1-10, Daniel Wilburn by Natosha T. Lyons (jls, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Natosha T. Lyons (jls, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/4/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1564098 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Natosha T. Lyons (Mattingly, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. City of Ada, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natosha T. Lyons
Represented By: Jack Mattingly, Jr.
Represented By: Jarrett Adams
Represented By: Jeanette Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Ada, Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler W. Pogue
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan C. Collier
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Eaker
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Hospital Ada, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Goodson
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wilburn
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Ridgeway
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton Stonesipher
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Crook
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada, City of
Represented By: Scott B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?