Tabor v. Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teddy Wade Tabor
Defendant: Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00362
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nathan E. Clark on behalf of Air Evac EMS, Inc. (Clark, Nathan)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Air Evac EMS, Inc. (Clark, Nathan)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Defendant's [Motion for] Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond [to the Complaint] (Docket Entry #5 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by JANUARY 19. 2022. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 SPECIAL APPEARANCE and MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Nathan E. Clark on behalf of Air Evac EMS, Inc. (Clark, Nathan) Modified on 12/17/2021 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Air Evac EMS, Inc. (jls, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2021 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/7/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1592207 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Teddy Wade Tabor (Smolen, Daniel)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 12/13/2021) (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Air Evac EMS, Inc. by Teddy Wade Tabor (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Teddy Wade Tabor (tjm, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabor v. Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Wade Tabor
Represented By: Daniel E. Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan E. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?