Branch v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Malcolm Howell Branch and Malcolm H. Branch
Defendant: Zack Walker, Terry Wilson, Duane Thompson, H. Duane Rife, Mickey Schaffer, Dick Gaden, Okmulgee County Rural Water District No. 7 and Mickey Shaeffer
Case Number: 6:2022cv00209
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Property Damage (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER from U.S. Court Clerk for the Eastern District of Oklahoma to Okmulgee County District Court Clerk. (jls, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/3/2022) (jls, Deputy Clerk).
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, striking #3 Notice of Removal in light of #2 Opinion and Order remanding case to the District Court of Okmulgee County, Oklahoma. (tlp, Chambers)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE of Removal from Okmulgee County District Court, case number CJ-2022-70 by Malcolm Howell Branch. (jls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/3/2022 to edit file date (dma, Deputy Clerk).
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, remanding case to the District Court of Okmulgee County, Oklahoma. (tlp, Chambers)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Okmulgee County District Court, case number CJ-2022-70 by Malcolm Howell Branch. (With attachments) (jls, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/22/2022 in the amount of $402, receipt number 20385 (Re: #1 Notice of Removal ). (jls, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Plaintiff is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Filing Fee due by 7/29/2022. (jls, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Dick Gaden, H. Duane Rife, Okmulgee County Rural Water District No. 7, Oklahoma, Mickey Schaffer, Duane Thompson, Zack Walker, Terry Wilson by Malcolm Howell Branch. (jls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/22/2022 (jls, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Howell Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm H. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Duane Rife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Gaden
Represented By: Luke Gaither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okmulgee County Rural Water District No. 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?