Young et al v. Kerr-McGee Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Young and Amanda Fries
Defendant: Kerr-McGee Corp., Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Nuclear Corp., Sequoyah Fuels Corp., General Atomics, Sequoyah Holding Corp. and Quivira Mining Corp.
Case Number: 6:2022cv00280
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by District Judge Eric F. Melgren granting Defendants' #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp., and Anadarko Petroleum Corp. answer due 12/8/2022. Defendants' #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is found moot. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by District Judge Eric F. Melgren granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sequoyah Fuels Corp. and General Atomics answer due 12/12/2022. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
November 23, 2022 Filing 35 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #29 Amended Complaint, ) by Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. Responses due by 12/7/2022(Rudnicki, Leah)
November 23, 2022 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: #29 Amended Complaint, ) by General Atomics, Sequoyah Fuels Corp. Responses due by 12/7/2022(English, Michael)
November 22, 2022 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #29 Amended Complaint) by Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. Responses due by 12/6/2022 (Rudnicki, Leah)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by District Judge Eric F. Melgren denying without prejudice Defendant's #12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #13 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim, and #14 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim as moot. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2022 Filing 31 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sequoyah Holding Corp. (eaw, Deputy Clerk).
November 14, 2022 Filing 30 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Quivira Mining Corp. (eaw, Deputy Clerk).
November 14, 2022 Filing 29 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kerr-McGee Corp.; Anadarko Petroleum Corp.; Occidental Petroleum Corp.; Sequoyah Fuels Corp.; Sequoyah Holding Corp.; General Atomics and Quivira Mining Corp. (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Amanda Fries, Michelle Young (Thigpen, Cheryl) Modified on 11/17/2022 to edit parties (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 10, 2022 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lindsey Titus Levy on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. (Levy, Lindsey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Duke K. McCall, III on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. (McCall, Duke)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Eric F. Melgren granting #18 and #19 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Duke K. McCall, III and Lindsey Titus Levy for Anadarko Petroleum Corp, Kerr-McGee Corp, and Occidental Petroleum Corp. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2022 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corp. for Kerr-McGee Corp.) by Kerr-McGee Corp. (Rudnicki, Leah)
November 9, 2022 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Occidental Petroleum Corp.) by Occidental Petroleum Corp. (Rudnicki, Leah) Modified on 11/15/2022 to add corporation (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 9, 2022 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corp. for Anadarko Petroleum Corp.) by Anadarko Petroleum Corp. (Rudnicki, Leah)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Eric F. Melgren granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Responses are due by 11/14/2022 (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim, #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim). (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of United States District Judge John F. Heil, III, and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren, of the District of Kansas, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-22-280-EFM. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2022 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Roger Brent Blackstock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blackstock, Roger)
November 1, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Lindsey T. Levy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1722356) by Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. (With attachments) Responses due by 11/15/2022(Rudnicki, Leah)
November 1, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Duke K. McCall III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1722352) by Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. (With attachments) Responses due by 11/15/2022(Rudnicki, Leah)
October 28, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim, #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) by All Plaintiffs; Responses due by 11/14/2022 (Thigpen, Cheryl)
October 24, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of United States District Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge John F. Heil, III. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-22-280-JFH (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-22-280-RAW. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by General Atomics Responses due by 11/4/2022(English, Michael)
October 21, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Sequoyah Fuels Corp. Responses due by 11/4/2022(English, Michael)
October 21, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. Responses due by 11/4/2022(Rudnicki, Leah)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting Defendants Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, and Kerr-McGee Corporation's Application for Extension of Time to File Answer (Docket Entry #10 ). Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond no later than OCTOBER 21, 2022. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. Responses due by 10/21/2022(Rudnicki, Leah)
October 7, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leah T. Rudnicki on behalf of Anadarko Petroleum Corp., Kerr-McGee Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. (Rudnicki, Leah)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting Defendants Sequoyah Fuels Corp. and General Atomics' First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Docket Entry #7 ). Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond no later than OCTOBER 21, 2022. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by General Atomics, Sequoyah Fuels Corp. Responses due by 10/19/2022 (English, Michael)
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael English on behalf of General Atomics, Sequoyah Fuels Corp. (English, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Linda C. Martin on behalf of General Atomics, Sequoyah Fuels Corp. (Martin, Linda)
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by N. Lance Bryan on behalf of General Atomics, Sequoyah Fuels Corp. (Bryan, N.)
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 10/7/2022) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Sequoyah County District Court, case number CJ-22-41 by General Atomics, Sequoyah Fuels Corp. (With attachments)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by General Atomics, Sequoyah Fuels Corp. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2022 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/30/2022 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1710738 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by General Atomics, Sequoyah Fuels Corp. (Bryan, N.)
April 8, 2022 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Anadarko Petroleum Corp., General Atomics, Kerr-McGee Corp., Kerr-McGee Nuclear Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp., Sequoyah Fuels Corp. by Amanda Fries, Michelle Young. (adw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Kerr-McGee Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Young
Represented By: Cheryl Minnix Thigpen
Represented By: Roger Brent Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Fries
Represented By: Cheryl Minnix Thigpen
Represented By: Roger Brent Blackstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr-McGee Corp.
Represented By: Duke K. McCall, III
Represented By: Lindsey Titus Levy
Represented By: Leah T. Rudnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Duke K. McCall, III
Represented By: Leah T. Rudnicki
Represented By: Lindsey Titus Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Duke K. McCall, III
Represented By: Lindsey Titus Levy
Represented By: Leah T. Rudnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr-McGee Nuclear Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoyah Fuels Corp.
Represented By: N. Lance Bryan
Represented By: Linda C. Martin
Represented By: Michael English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Atomics
Represented By: N. Lance Bryan
Represented By: Linda C. Martin
Represented By: Michael English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoyah Holding Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quivira Mining Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?