Smith v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lisa Akins Smith
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2023cv00312
Filed: September 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gerald L Jackson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson, directing that the parties present their respective positions and legal authorities regarding the judicial review: Opening brief of Plaintiff due 12/6/23; response brief of Defendant due 30 days after opening brief of Plaintiff is filed. No extensions of time will be granted unless exceptional circumstances are provided to the Court. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 14 days from the date the response brief of Defendant is filed. The case will be submitted to the Court for decision after the briefs are filed. Oral arguments before the Court will not be set herein unless requested within 30 days from this date. All motions to remand must state specifically whether it is a sentence 4 or sentence 6 remand. (Social Security Opening Brief due by 12/6/2023, Social Security Response Brief due by 1/5/2024, Social Security Reply Brief due by 1/19/2024)(acg, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Social Security Administration. (With attachments) (O'Malley, Michael)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties have expressly indicated by submission of consent forms signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1). As a result, this case is deemed CONSENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The consent forms will be maintained in the Clerk's office. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). (acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darren T. Rackley on behalf of Lisa Akins Smith (Rackley, Darren)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gayle L. Troutman on behalf of Lisa Akins Smith (Troutman, Gayle)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Supporting Affidavit by Lisa Akins Smith Responses due by 9/27/2023 (Troutman, Gayle)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael J. O'Malley on behalf of Social Security Administration (O'Malley, Michael)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/3/2023)(jld, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The Court has notified the Commissioner of the Complaint pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Appeals. No summons will be issued. (Filing Fee due by 9/19/2023) (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) (jld, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Lisa Akins Smith. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lisa Akins Smith. (jld, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Akins Smith
Represented By: Gayle L. Troutman
Represented By: Darren T. Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Michael J. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?