Doe 1 et al v. Juvenile Bureau of Tulsa County District Court et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1, Parent Doe 2, Parent Doe 1, Parent Doe 3, Parent Doe 4, Parent Doe 5, Parent Doe 6, Parent Doe 7, Parent Doe 8, Parent Doe 9, Parent Doe 10, Parent Doe 11, Parent Doe 12, Parent Doe 13, Parent Doe 14, Parent Doe 15, Parent Doe 16, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2 and Child Does 21-30
Defendant: Office of Juvenile Affairs, Mandi Lee Raymond, Tulsa County Board of County Commissioners, Jonathan Hines, Cindy Treadway, Cortez Tunley, Anthony Taylor, Douglas Currington, Alondo Edwards, Austin Zenzen, Rachel Holt, Dquan Doyle, Ben Brown, Jeffrey Cartmell, Juvenile Bureau of Tulsa County District Court, Kevin Gray, Curtice Williams, DQ, Cierra Manning, Sparkle Johnson, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Sharon Wilson, Shaylonda Powell, Kelly Lavine, Carrie Loyd, Torie Gray, Derek Harris, John Does 2-10, Jane Does 2-10 and Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC
Case Number: 6:2024cv00182
Filed: May 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2024 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #62 Opposed MOTION to Stay ) by Child Does 1-16, Child Does 21-30, Child Does 4-20, Child Does 8-30, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Parent Doe 1, Parent Doe 10, Parent Doe 11, Parent Doe 12, Parent Doe 13, Parent Doe 14, Parent Doe 15, Parent Doe 16, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Parent Doe 2, Parent Doe 3, Parent Doe 4, Parent Doe 5, Parent Doe 6, Parent Doe 7, Parent Doe 8, Parent Doe 9 ; (With attachments)(Brecht, Christopher)
July 19, 2024 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ben Brown - Served on 7/18/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 19, 2024 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kevin Gray - Served on 7/18/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 19, 2024 Filing 74 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Cortez Tunley - Served on 7/18/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 19, 2024 Filing 73 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Curtice Williams - Served on 7/18/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 18, 2024 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kelly Lavine - Served on 7/15/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 18, 2024 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sharon Wilson - Served on 7/18/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 18, 2024 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Shaylonda Powell - Served on 7/15/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 18, 2024 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Office of Juvenile Affairs - Served on 7/16/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 18, 2024 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jonathan Hines - Served on 7/16/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 18, 2024 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Alondo Edwards - Served on 7/16/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 18, 2024 Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Douglas Currington - Served on 7/16/2024. by Parent Doe 4; John Doe 2; Parent Doe 2; Parent Doe 1; Parent Doe 7; Parent Doe 13; Child Does 1-16; Child Does 8-30; Parent Doe 8; Parent Doe 14; Child Does 21-30; Parent Doe 10; Parent Doe 9; Jane Doe 2; Parent Doe 15; Parent Doe 6; Parent Doe 11; Parent Doe 3; Parent Doe 5; Jane Doe 1; Parent Doe 16; Parent Doe 12; John Doe 1; Child Does 4-20 (Brecht, Christopher)
July 15, 2024 Filing 65 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Mochulsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mochulsky, Christopher)
July 15, 2024 Filing 64 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John W. Warren on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Warren, John)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White directing Plaintiffs to file an EXPEDITED Response to #62 Opposed MOTION to Stay by 7/19/2024. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2024 Filing 62 Opposed MOTION to Stay by Dquan Doyle Responses due by 7/26/2024(Kittle, Timothy)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White directing Plaintiffs' Counsel to file a Notice when all defendants have been served and advising that the case is ready to be set for hearing. (Re: #34 Order) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 60 NOTICE to the Court (Re: #31 Amended Complaint) by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) (Brecht, Christopher)
July 9, 2024 Filing 59 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 58 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Juvenile Bureau of Tulsa County District Court. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 57 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Torie Gray. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 56 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Office of Juvenile Affairs. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 55 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sparkle Johnson. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 54 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Shaylonda Powell. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 53 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sharon Wilson. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 52 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Rachel Holt. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 51 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Mandi Lee Raymond. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 50 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kevin Gray. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 49 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kelly Lavine. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 48 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jonathan Hines. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 47 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jeffrey Cartmell. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 46 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Douglas Currington. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 45 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Derek Harris. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 44 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Curtice Williams. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 43 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Cortez Tunley. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 42 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Cindy Treadway. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2024 Filing 41 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Cierra Manning. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2024 Filing 40 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Carrie Loyd. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2024 Filing 39 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tulsa County Board of County Commissioners. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2024 Filing 38 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ben Brown. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2024 Filing 37 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Austin Zenzen. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2024 Filing 36 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Anthony Taylor. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2024 Filing 35 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Alondo Edwards. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White (Re: #24 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2024 Filing 33 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #31 Second Amended Complaint) by All Plaintiffs (Brecht, Christopher)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White directing Plaintiffs to submit a red line version of the Second Amended Complaint by Tuesday, July 9, 2024 (Re: #31 Second Amended Complaint). (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2024 Filing 31 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #6 Amended Complaint) by Parent Doe 4, Parent Doe 2, Parent Doe 1, Parent Doe 7, Jane Doe 2, Parent Doe 6, Parent Doe 5, Parent Doe 3, Jane Doe 1, Parent Doe 10, Parent Doe 15, Parent Doe 11, Parent Doe 8, John Doe 2, Parent Doe 9, Parent Doe 12, John Doe 1, Parent Doe 16, Child Does 21-30, Parent Doe 14, Parent Doe 13 [NOTE: Attorney Christopher U. Brecht added to parties Parent Doe 8, Parent Doe 9, Parent Doe 10, Parent Doe 11, Parent Doe 12, Parent Doe 13, Parent Doe 14, Parent Doe 15, Parent Doe 16, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Child Does 21-30]. (Brecht, Christopher)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: In light of anticipated filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, the current deadline of Defendant Dquan Doyle to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is stricken. Accordingly, Defendant Doyle's #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is deemed moot. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2024 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court and in light of the recusal of District Judge John F. Heil, III, this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. District Judge John F. Heil, III no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-182-RAW (tls, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2024 Filing 28 Amended Advice to the Court by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) (Brecht, Christopher)
June 27, 2024 Filing 27 Advice to the Court by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) (Brecht, Christopher)
June 27, 2024 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-182-JFH. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: In light of the filing of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket Entry #24 ) and the lack of consents to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction at this early stage of the case, the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to a United States District Judge for further adjudication. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2024 Filing 24 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Opening Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 7/10/2024 (Brecht, Christopher)
June 26, 2024 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) by Dquan Doyle Responses due by 7/10/2024(Kittle, Timothy)
June 26, 2024 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy S. Kittle on behalf of Dquan Doyle (Kittle, Timothy)
June 25, 2024 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Dquan Doyle - Served on 6/5/2024 by Plaintiffs (Smolen, Donald)
June 11, 2024 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Destyn D. Stanton on behalf of Dquan Doyle (Stanton, Destyn)
June 11, 2024 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David R. Keesling on behalf of Dquan Doyle (Keesling, David)
June 5, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Dquan Doyle. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2024 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jane Doe 2 (Smolen, Donald)
May 30, 2024 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jane Doe 1 (Smolen, Donald)
May 30, 2024 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parent Doe 7 (Smolen, Donald)
May 30, 2024 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parent Doe 6 (Smolen, Donald)
May 30, 2024 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parent Doe 5 (Smolen, Donald)
May 30, 2024 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parent Doe 4 (Smolen, Donald)
May 30, 2024 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parent Doe 3 (Smolen, Donald)
May 30, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parent Doe 2 (Smolen, Donald)
May 30, 2024 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parent Doe 1 (Smolen, Donald)
May 28, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael F. Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Michael)
May 28, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald E. Smolen, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smolen, Donald)
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Plaintiffs (Smolen, Donald)
May 24, 2024 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 5/24/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number BOKEDC-1949594 (Re: #2 Complaint) by All Plaintiffs (Brecht, Christopher)
May 23, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days.(Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/13/2024) (jld, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $405 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 5/30/2024) (Re: #2 Complaint) (jld, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs (jld, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs (jld, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2024 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 5/23/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number 22283. (Re: #2 Complaint) (jld, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. Juvenile Bureau of Tulsa County District Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Juvenile Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandi Lee Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Treadway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez Tunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Currington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alondo Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Zenzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dquan Doyle
Represented By: Timothy S. Kittle
Represented By: Destyn D. Stanton
Represented By: David R. Keesling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juvenile Bureau of Tulsa County District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DQ
Represented By: Timothy S. Kittle
Represented By: Destyn D. Stanton
Represented By: David R. Keesling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cierra Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparkle Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaylonda Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torie Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 2
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 1
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 3
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 4
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 5
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 6
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 7
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 8
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 9
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 10
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 11
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 12
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 13
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 14
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 15
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parent Doe 16
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Michael F. Smith
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Represented By: Donald E. Smolen, II
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Child Does 21-30
Represented By: Christopher U. Brecht
Represented By: John W. Warren
Represented By: Christopher Mochulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?