Consolidated Resource Company LLC v. Apache Corporation
Petitioner: Consolidated Resource Company LLC
Respondent: Apache Corporation
Case Number: 6:2024cv00310
Filed: August 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jason A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2024 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Oklahoma Western
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 08/26/2024. (jb) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 08/26/2024. (jb) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
August 23, 2024 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Substitute Exhibit by Apache Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 2 - Order & Judgment)(Banner, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
August 22, 2024 Filing 23 COUNTER MOTION for Summary Judgment by Apache Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Plf's Second Amended petition, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Unopposed Motion for order Auth Payment, #3 Exhibit Exh 3 - Unclaimed Property Report, #4 Exhibit Exh 4 - Unclaimed Property Report & Payment Confirm, #5 Exhibit Exh 5 - Notice of Mailing List, #6 Exhibit Exh 6 - Payment Report Exceprt)(Banner, Mark) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/26/2024 pursuant to #25 Order) (jb). [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
August 22, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Apache Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Plf's Second Amended petition, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Unopposed Motion for order Auth Payment, #3 Exhibit Exh 3 - Unclaimed Property Report, #4 Exhibit Exh 4 - Unclaimed Property Report & Payment Confirm, #5 Exhibit Exh 5 - Notice of Mailing List, #6 Exhibit Exh 6 - Payment Report Exceprt)(Banner, Mark) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/26/2024 pursuant to #25 Order) (jb). [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
August 1, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by Consolidated Resource Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order and Judgment Granting Approval of Class Action Settlement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Oil and Gas Lease, #3 Exhibit 3 - Calculation of Interest, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Granting Prelim Approval)(Russell, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
July 30, 2024 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings by Apache Corporation. (Banner, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
July 17, 2024 Filing 19 Exhibit List / Witness List by Defendant Apache Corporation. (Banner, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
July 3, 2024 Filing 18 Exhibit List / Witness List by Plaintiff Consolidated Resource Company LLC. (Russell, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
May 9, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Defendant's Brief in Support of Transferring this Action to the Eastern District of Oklahoma filed by Consolidated Resource Company LLC. (Russell, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
May 9, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Proper Venue filed by Apache Corporation. (Banner, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Order, by Consolidated Resource Company LLC. (Russell, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case by Apache Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opinion and Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Apache's Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures)(Banner, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to each submit a brief addressing whether this case should be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma within 14 days of the date of this Order. Each side may then respond to the other's initial brief within 14 days. No reply briefs shall be permitted without leave of the Court. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 04/11/2024. (jb) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due within 14 days; Motions to amend due within 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 06/20/2024; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days thereafter; Pla witness list due 07/05/2024; Dft witness list due 14 days thereafter; Pla exhibit list due 07/05/2024; Dft exhibit list due 14 days thereafter; Motions in limine due 10/07/2024; Jury instructions due 10/07/2024; Voir dire requests due 10/07/2024; ADR Completion Date due by 9/15/2024. Discovery due by 9/3/2024. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 305 before Judge Charles Goodwin. Motions due by 8/1/2024. Pretrial Report due by 10/7/2024. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 03/06/2024. (jb) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
February 28, 2024 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Consolidated Resource Company LLC. (Russell, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
February 12, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Consolidated Resource Company LLC . (Russell, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Plaintiff shall file its disclosure statement within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 02/05/2024. (jb) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2024 11:20 AM telephonically before Judge Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 2/28/2024. (jb) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
January 24, 2024 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew C Russell on behalf of Consolidated Resource Company LLC (Russell, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Katresa J Riffel on behalf of Consolidated Resource Company LLC (Riffel, Katresa) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
December 28, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Apache Corporation . (Banner, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
December 28, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Apache Corporation.(Banner, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mason B. McMillan on behalf of Apache Corporation (McMillan, Mason) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Banner on behalf of Apache Corporation (Banner, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Major County District Court, case number CJ-2023-26 filed by Apache Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons issued to Apache Corporation, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons - Return of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance on behalf of Apache Corporation, #5 Exhibit 5 - Major County Docket (CJ-2023-00026), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rp) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]
December 21, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE (Removal from Major County) Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4321148. (Banner, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 8/27/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consolidated Resource Company LLC v. Apache Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Consolidated Resource Company LLC
Represented By: Matthew C Russell
Represented By: Katresa J. Riffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Apache Corporation
Represented By: Mason B. McMillan
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?