Dinsmore et al v. Staghorn Petroleum II, LLC
Plaintiff: Sheridan Downey, III and Marvin B. Dinsmore
Defendant: Staghorn Petroleum II, LLC
Case Number: 6:2024cv00369
Filed: October 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jason A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: In light of the certification of the settlement class in this case, the Scheduling Conference set for November 26, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. is hereby STRICKEN. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson granting #17 Motion to Certify Class; granting #17 Motion for Final Fairness Hearing. Final Fairness Hearing is set for 2/18/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson granting #17 Motion to Certify Class; granting #17 Motion for Final Fairness Hearing. Final Fairness Hearing is set for 2/17/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: ZOOM Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2024. (Re: #17 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION for Hearing) (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Certify the Settlement Class for Settlement Purposes, to Preliminarily Approve the Class Action Settlement, to Approve the Form and Manner of Notice, and to Set a Date for a Final Fairness Hearing (Docket Entry #17 ) shall be considered at a video hearing with counsel on NOVEMBER 5, 2024 AT 10:00 A.M. in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. The Court will e-mail counsel the ZOOM video link for the hearing approximately 30 minutes before the scheduled time. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2024 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Certify Class the Settlement Class for Purposes, to Preliminarily Approve the Form and Manner of Notice, and MOTION to Set a Date for a Final Fairness Hearing by All Plaintiffs (With attachments) Responses due by 10/31/2024 (Bradford, Reagan). Added MOTION for Hearing on 10/21/2024 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 11/7/2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: The parties have expressly indicated by submission of a consent form signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. As a result, this case is deemed CONSENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The consent forms will be maintained in the Clerk's office. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Under Seal (Docket Entry #13 ) is hereby GRANTED. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Staghorn Petroleum II, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 10/23/2024(Brown, Travis)
October 7, 2024 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James U. White, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (White, James)
October 7, 2024 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lauren Marie Brown on behalf of Staghorn Petroleum II, LLC (Brown, Lauren)
October 7, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Matt Hill on behalf of Staghorn Petroleum II, LLC (Hill, J.)
October 7, 2024 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Travis P. Brown on behalf of Staghorn Petroleum II, LLC (Brown, Travis)
October 4, 2024 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sheridan Downey, III (Bradford, Reagan)
October 4, 2024 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marvin B. Dinsmore (Bradford, Reagan)
October 4, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan K. Wilson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilson, Ryan)
October 4, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $405 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 10/11/2024) (Re: #2 Complaint) (rak, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Staghorn Petroleum II, LLC by Marvin B. Dinsmore and Sheridan Downey, III. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Marvin B. Dinsmore and Sheridan Downey, III. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2024 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/4/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-2000811 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Marvin B. Dinsmore, Sheridan Downey, III (Wilson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dinsmore et al v. Staghorn Petroleum II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staghorn Petroleum II, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Marie Brown
Represented By: J. Matt Hill
Represented By: Travis P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheridan Downey, III
Represented By: Ryan K. Wilson
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Represented By: James U. White, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin B. Dinsmore
Represented By: Ryan K. Wilson
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Represented By: James U. White, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?