Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD v. Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD
Defendant: Staples, Inc. and Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2024cv00437
Filed: November 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jason A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2025 Filing 29 Preliminary EXHIBIT LIST by Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (Robertson, Rob)
January 6, 2025 Filing 28 Preliminary WITNESS LIST by Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (Robertson, Rob)
January 6, 2025 Filing 27 Preliminary EXHIBIT LIST by Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD (Brydie, Isaiah)
January 6, 2025 Filing 26 Preliminary WITNESS LIST by Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD (Brydie, Isaiah)
December 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Joint Motion to Extend the Preliminary Witness and Exhibit List is GRANTED. The Preliminary Witness and Exhibit Lists of all parties is now due on or before 1/06/2025. (Robertson, Jason)
December 30, 2024 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to Exchange and File Preliminary Witness and Exhibit Lists by All Parties; Responses due by 1/13/2025 (Robertson, Rob)
December 23, 2024 Filing 23 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (Robertson, Rob)
December 23, 2024 Filing 22 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD (Brydie, Isaiah)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Five-Day Extension of Time to Exchange and File Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Docket Entry No. #20 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall exchange and file the disclosures by DECEMBER 24, 2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2024 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendants to File Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by All Defendants; Responses due by 12/31/2024 (Robertson, Rob)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson setting Settlement Conference for 4/22/2025 at 9:00 AM in Chambers, Room 327, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Settlement Conference Statements due by 4/8/2025. (daw, Chambers)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson setting Scheduling Order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2025; Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2025; Status Report due by 1/31/2025; Exhibit List due by 2/28/2025; Witness List due by 2/28/2025; Discovery due by 3/28/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 4/11/2025; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 8/8/2025; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2025; Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Jury Trial set for 9/2/2025 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2024 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD, Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (Robertson, Rob)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File the Joint Status Report (Docket No. #15 ) is GRANTED. The Joint Status Report is now due on or before Wednesday, December 11, 2024. (Robertson, Jason)
December 6, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Extend Deadline to file Joint Status Report by All Parties Responses due by 12/20/2024 (Robertson, Rob)
November 21, 2024 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cole Thomas McDaniel on behalf of Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc. and Staples, Inc. (McDaniel, Cole) Modified on 11/29/2024 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Based on the consents submitted by the parties, the ZOOM Rule 73 Status Conference set for 11/21/2024 at 2:00 PM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson is STRICKEN. The parties are reminded to file their Joint Status Report by 12/6/2024. The Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson is STRICKEN. A Scheduling Order will be entered by the Court based on the information provided by the parties in the Joint Status Report. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties have expressly indicated in the Consent Forms submitted to the Clerk and signed by all counsel of record in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1). As a result, this case is deemed CONSENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE without the necessity for the filing or submission of any other documentation. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2024 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Isaiah N. Brydie on behalf of Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD (With attachments)(Brydie, Isaiah)
November 15, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (Robertson, Rob)
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson setting ZOOM Rule 73 Status Conference for 11/21/2024 at 2:00 PM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. A ZOOM link will be provided to all parties approximately 30 minutes prior to the hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 12/6/2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rob F. Robertson on behalf of Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (Robertson, Rob)
November 11, 2024 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/11/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-2016611 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (Robertson, Rob)
November 8, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2024 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Defendant is directed to pay the $405 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 11/15/2024) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) (rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Pontotoc County District Court, case number CJ-24-165 by Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Defendants' Counterclaims filed in State Court (Re: Counterclaim filed in State Court) by Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD (rak, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2024 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Petition filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition) by Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc., Staples, Inc. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2024 COUNTERCLAIM filed in State Court against Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD by Staples, Inc., Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2024 PETITION filed in State Court against All Defendants by Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD. (rak, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD v. Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples, Inc.
Represented By: Rob F. Robertson
Represented By: Cole Thomas McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples the Office Superstore East, Inc.
Represented By: Rob F. Robertson
Represented By: Cole Thomas McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Real Estate Joint Venture, LTD
Represented By: Isaiah N. Brydie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?