Central Mutual Insurance Company v. CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC
Counter-Defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Counter-Claimant: CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC
Case Number: 6:2024cv00443
Filed: November 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: D Edward Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2025 Filing 24 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC (Hulin, James)
January 9, 2025 Filing 23 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Central Mutual Insurance Company (Cathcart, W.)
January 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting Settlement Conference for 7/8/2025 at 9:00 AM in Chambers, Room 327, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson. Settlement Conference statements due by 6/24/2025. (daw, Chambers)
January 8, 2025 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Mutual Insurance Company (With attachments)(Cathcart, W.)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting scheduling order date(s): Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 1/17/2025. Exhibit List due by 6/6/2025. Witness List due by 6/6/2025. Discovery due by 7/7/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2025. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 10/15/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2025 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 201, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. The Scheduling Conference previously set for 1/8/2025 is hereby STRICKEN. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow: The parties have expressly indicated in the Joint Status Report signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. As a result, this case is deemed CONSENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE without the necessity for the filing or submission of any other documentation. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow RESETTING Telephonic Scheduling Conference from 1/9/2025 to 1/8/2025 at 1:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. The Court will initiate the phone conference. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/3/2025 to show telephone conference. (tjm, Deputy Clerk).
December 26, 2024 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Central Mutual Insurance Company (Cathcart, W.)
December 17, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC ; (With attachments)(Hulin, James)
December 12, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/26/2024(Cathcart, W.)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting Scheduling Conference for 1/9/2025 at 1:30 PM in Chambers, Room 201, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 1/3/2025. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim (Re: #8 Counterclaim) by Central Mutual Insurance Company [NOTE: Attorney W. R. Cathcart added to party Central Mutual Insurance Company(pty:cd)]. (Cathcart, W.)
December 3, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties have expressly indicated by submission of consent forms signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. As a result, this case is deemed CONSENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The consent forms will be maintained in the Clerk's office. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). The Rule 73 Conference previously set for 12/4/2024 is hereby stricken. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2024 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by W. R. Cathcart on behalf of Central Mutual Insurance Company (Cathcart, W.)
November 26, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Burl Hulin on behalf of CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC (Hulin, James)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting Rule 73 Conference for 12/4/2024 at 1:30 PM in Chambers, Room 201, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2024 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Central Mutual Insurance Company by CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC ***Part 2 of 2 part document. See pleading #7 *** (dma, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC (With attachments) ***Part 1 of 2 part document. See pleading #8 *** (Ottaway, Larry) Modified on 11/25/2024 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 13, 2024 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/13/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-2017465 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC (sms, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry D. Ottaway on behalf of CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC (Ottaway, Larry)
November 13, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Defendant is directed to pay the $405 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 11/20/2024) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) (rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Carter County District Court, case number CJ-24-250 by CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2024 PETITION filed in State Court against CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (rak, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Mutual Insurance Company v. CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: W. R. Cathcart
Represented By: Tyler L. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: James Burl Hulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: W. R. Cathcart
Represented By: Tyler L. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: CCA Construction Consulting Associates, LLC
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?