Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. v. Marina Del Rey, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hull's Environmental Services, Inc.
Defendant: Marshall County Board of County Commissioners, Secretary of Army/ U.S. Army Corps. of Engineers, Garrett Johnson, Marina Del Rey, Inc., Todds A/C, Inc., Midwest Dozer doing business as Midwest Dozer, LLC., Argonaut Insurance Company, SMS Financial Strategic Investments V, LLC., Marshall County Treasurer and Oklahoma, State of
Cross-Complainant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Cross-Defendant: Marina Del Rey, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2024cv00479
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jason A Robertson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2025 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) by Secretary of Army/ U.S. Army Corps. of Engineers (O'Malley, Michael)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Docket No. #20 ) is GRANTED. The reply deadline is now on or before February 4, 2025. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2025 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) by Secretary of Army/ U.S. Army Corps. of Engineers; Responses due by 2/12/2025 (O'Malley, Michael) Modified on 1/30/2025 to edit event and add link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
January 22, 2025 Filing 19 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Garrett Johnson, Marina Del Rey, Inc. (Williams, Emily)
January 15, 2025 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) by Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. (Pfrehm, Carrie)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Docket Entry No. #16 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants Marina Del Rey, LLC and Garrett Johnson shall answer or otherwise respond to the Petition no later than JANUARY 22, 2025. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2025 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Garrett Johnson, Marina Del Rey, Inc. Responses due by 1/22/2025 (Linscott, Michael)
January 8, 2025 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emily E. Williams on behalf of Garrett Johnson, Marina Del Rey, Inc. (Williams, Emily)
January 8, 2025 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael S. Linscott on behalf of Garrett Johnson, Marina Del Rey, Inc. (Linscott, Michael)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline (Docket Entry No. #12 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry No. #9 ) no later than JANUARY 15, 2025. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
December 31, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ) by Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. Responses due by 1/14/2025(Pfrehm, Carrie)
December 20, 2024 Filing 11 CROSS-CLAIM against Marina Del Rey, Inc. by Argonaut Insurance Company (Melendi, Stephen)
December 20, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Argonaut Insurance Company [NOTE: Attorney Stephen A. Melendi added to party Argonaut Insurance Company(pty:dft)]. (Melendi, Stephen)
December 18, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Secretary of Army/ U.S. Army Corps. of Engineers Responses due by 1/1/2025(Sisemore, Alexander)
December 13, 2024 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. (Mordy, Mike)
December 13, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexander J. Sisemore on behalf of Secretary of Army/ U.S. Army Corps. of Engineers (Sisemore, Alexander)
December 13, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mike Mordy on behalf of Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. (Mordy, Mike)
December 12, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(rak, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Marshall County District Court, case number CJ-2024-86 by Secretary of Army/ U.S. Army Corps. of Engineers. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Secretary of Army/ U.S. Army Corps. of Engineers. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Petition filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition) by Marshall County Treasurer, Marshall County Board of County Commissioners. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2024 PETITION filed in State Court against All Defendants by Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. (rak, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hull's Environmental Services, Inc. v. Marina Del Rey, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Army/ U.S. Army Corps. of Engineers
Represented By: Michael J. O'Malley
Represented By: Alexander J. Sisemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Johnson
Represented By: Michael S. Linscott
Represented By: Emily E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina Del Rey, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Linscott
Represented By: Emily E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todds A/C, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Dozer doing business as Midwest Dozer, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen A. Melendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS Financial Strategic Investments V, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall County Treasurer
Represented By: Douglas Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hull's Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Pfrehm
Represented By: Mike Mordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen A. Melendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Marina Del Rey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?