Durant Industrial Authority v. SG Blocks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Durant Industrial Authority
Defendant: SGB Development Corp., SG Echo, LLC, David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune, SG Blocks, Inc., Gerald Sheeran, LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC, Safe & Green Holdings Corp., Paul Galvin, Paul Gavin, Austerra Stable Growth Fund, LP and Safe and Green Development Corp.
Case Number: 6:2024cv00498
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: D Edward Snow
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2025 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #27 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Durant Industrial Authority ;(Williams, D.)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting #36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: 27 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction) Responses due by 2/17/2025. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2025 Filing 39 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew T. Hambelton on behalf of David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune, Safe and Green Development Corp., LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC (Hambelton, Andrew)
February 6, 2025 Filing 38 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Austerra Stable Growth Fund, LP (With attachments)(Bickle, Brandon)
February 6, 2025 Filing 37 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Austerra Stable Growth Fund, LP (Bickle, Brandon)
February 6, 2025 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #27 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Durant Industrial Authority Responses due by 2/20/2025(James, Logan)
February 5, 2025 Filing 35 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert J. Getchell on behalf of Austerra Stable Growth Fund, LP (Getchell, Robert)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting #30 MOTION for Attorney Andrew T. Hambelton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting #32 Unopposed MOTION to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time. Austerra Stable Growth Fund, LP to file responsive pleading by 2/6/2025. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2025 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time by Austerra Stable Growth Fund, LP Responses due by 2/18/2025(Bickle, Brandon)
February 4, 2025 Filing 31 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon C. Bickle on behalf of Austerra Stable Growth Fund, LP (Bickle, Brandon)
January 31, 2025 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney Andrew T. Hambelton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-2048503) by David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune, Safe and Green Development Corp., LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 2/14/2025 (Boyer, Jared)
January 27, 2025 Filing 29 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC (Boyer, Jared)
January 27, 2025 Filing 28 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Safe and Green Development Corp. (Boyer, Jared)
January 27, 2025 Filing 27 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune (With attachments) Responses due by 2/10/2025(Boyer, Jared)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: The parties are advised that this case has been referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow for all pretrial and discovery matters, including dispositive motions, in accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-24-498-RAW-DES. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2025 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-498-RAW. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2025 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hillary Hurst on behalf of Durant Industrial Authority (Hurst, Hillary)
January 14, 2025 Filing 23 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by SG Blocks, Inc., Safe & Green Holdings Corp., SG Echo, LLC (Lennon, John)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SG Blocks, Inc. answer due 1/14/2025; SG Echo, LLC answer due 1/14/2025; Safe & Green Holdings Corp. answer due 1/14/2025. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2025 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SG Echo, LLC (Lennon, John)
January 13, 2025 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SG Blocks, Inc. (Lennon, John)
January 13, 2025 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safe & Green Holdings Corp. (Lennon, John)
January 13, 2025 Filing 18 Second Unopposed MOTION to File Answer Out of Time by SG Blocks, Inc., Safe & Green Holdings Corp., SG Echo, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 1/27/2025 (Lennon, John) Modified to update text on 1/13/2025 (jld, Deputy Clerk).
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants SG Blocks, Inc., SG Echo, LLC, and Safe & Green Holdings Corp to file answer by 1/10/2025. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2025 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by SG Blocks, Inc., Safe & Green Holdings Corp., SG Echo, LLC Responses due by 1/21/2025(Lennon, John)
January 7, 2025 Filing 15 Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Durant Industrial Authority (Williams, D.)
January 6, 2025 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) re: Austerra Stable Growth Fund, LP - Served on 12/28/24 by Durant Industrial Authority (Williams, D.) Modified on 1/7/2025 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
January 3, 2025 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Durant Industrial Authority (Williams, D.)
January 2, 2025 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safe and Green Development Corp. (Boyer, Jared)
January 2, 2025 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Safe and Green Development Corp. for LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC) by LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC (Boyer, Jared)
January 2, 2025 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Villarreal (Boyer, Jared)
January 2, 2025 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nicolai Brune (Boyer, Jared)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune, Safe and Green Development Corp., and LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC's Answer or other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is due January 27, 2025. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2025 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune, Safe and Green Development Corp., LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC Responses due by 1/16/2025(Boyer, Jared)
January 1, 2025 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/1/2025 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-2035520 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune, Safe and Green Development Corp. FKA SGB Development Corp., LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC (Boyer, Jared)
December 27, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jared R. Boyer on behalf of David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune, Safe and Green Development Corp., LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC (Boyer, Jared)
December 26, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(rak, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2024 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at # https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Defendant is directed to pay the $405 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 1/2/2025) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) (rak, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number CJ-2024-249 by David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune, Safe and Green Development Corp. FKA SGB Development Corp., LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/27/2024 to edit filing date (rak, Deputy Clerk).
December 26, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by David Villarreal, Nicolai Brune, Safe and Green Development Corp. FKA SGB Development Corp., and LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC. (rak, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2024 PETITION filed in State Court against All Defendants by Durant Industrial Authority. (rak, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durant Industrial Authority v. SG Blocks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGB Development Corp.
Represented By: Jared R. Boyer
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Echo, LLC
Represented By: John C. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Villarreal
Represented By: Jared R. Boyer
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolai Brune
Represented By: Jared R. Boyer
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Blocks, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Sheeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Peninsula Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jared R. Boyer
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe & Green Holdings Corp.
Represented By: John C. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Galvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austerra Stable Growth Fund, LP
Represented By: Robert J. Getchell
Represented By: Brandon C. Bickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe and Green Development Corp.
Represented By: Jared R. Boyer
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Represented By: Andrew T. Hambelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durant Industrial Authority
Represented By: Logan L. James
Represented By: Hillary Hurst
Represented By: D. Kenyon Williams, Jr
Represented By: Bryan J. Nowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?