Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheeha v. Trive Capital Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheeha and Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust
Defendant: Trive Capital Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018ap01017
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terrence L Michael
Nature of Suit: (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference),13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer),14 (Recovery of money/property - other). Filed by Michael A. Brandess on behalf of Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheehan Pipe Line Liquid
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 Adversary Proceeding 4:18-ap-1017 Closed . (B, Adam)
July 24, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Michael A. Brandess on behalf of Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust. (Brandess, Michael)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Granting Second Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Related Doc #9). (B, Jo)
May 27, 2018 Filing 9 Second Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Thomas A. Creekmore III on behalf of Trive Capital Inc.. (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint). (Creekmore, Thomas)
May 14, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's Extension of Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint. It appears from the record that the Defendant Trive Capital Inc. filed the Application for Extension of Time within the time period permitted to serve an answer or responsive pleading to a complaint. Therefore, the Defendant Trive Capital Inc. is granted an additional 15 days, or until May 28, 2018, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Adversary Complaint as authorized by Local Rule 7012-1. (related document(s)#7). This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Form for this entry. No document is attached.(B, Stephanie)
May 11, 2018 Filing 7 Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Thomas A. Creekmore III on behalf of Trive Capital Inc.. (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint). (Creekmore, Thomas)
May 11, 2018 Filing 6 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Thomas A. Creekmore III on behalf of Trive Capital Inc.. (Creekmore, Thomas)
April 16, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Trive Capital Inc. . (RE: related document(s)#4 Summons Issued) Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Michael A. Brandess on behalf of Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust. (Brandess, Michael)
April 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued (B, Stephanie)
April 13, 2018 Filing 3 Receipt of Complaint(18-01017-M) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 4037122. Fee amount 350.00 (Re: Doc#1). (U.S. Treasury)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Filed by Michael A. Brandess on behalf of Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust. (Brandess, Michael)
April 13, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint by Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust vs. Trive Capital Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Nature of Suit: 12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference),13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer),14 (Recovery of money/property - other). Filed by Michael A. Brandess on behalf of Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust. (Brandess, Michael)

Search for this case: Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheeha v. Trive Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheeha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Myers, Liquidating Trustee of the Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust
Represented By: Michael A. Brandess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trive Capital Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Creekmore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?