Lambrix Crane Service Inc.
Debtor: Lambrix Crane Service Inc.
Us Trustee: Office of the United States Trustee
Trustee: Stephen John Moriarty
Case Number: 4:2021bk11056
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terrence L Michael
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 87 MINUTE: Status conference mandated by 11 U.S.C. 1188(a) held and concluded on 11/9/2021. (RE: related document(s) 57 Order Setting Status Conference (Subchapter V)). (AB)
November 5, 2021 Filing 86 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#85 BNC Notice). No. of Notices: 88. Notice Date 11/05/2021. (Admin.)
November 3, 2021 Filing 85 Notice to BNC of Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing (RE: related document(s) 84 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). (AB)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING. THIS MATTER comes before the Court pursuant to the Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing filed at Docket No. #80. The Court, being fully advised in the premises, finds cause to grant the motion. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Evidentiary Hearing by Video Conference scheduled for November 23, 2021, at 10:00 AM is hereby continued to November 30, 2021, at 10:00 AM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Technical Pre-Hearing Conference scheduled for November 23, 2021, at 9:00 AM is hereby continued to November 30, 2021, at 9:00 AM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other deadlines and instructions contained in the Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing by Video Conference and Establishing Related Deadlines entered at Docket No. #76, remain in full force and effect. BY THE COURT: Judge Terrence L. Michael. (text-only order) This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (Related Doc #73 Motion to Dismiss Case, #76 Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing, #80 Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing). (AB)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (J. Frasher Murphy) (Related Doc #64). (JB)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order Modifying the Automatic Stay (Related Doc #56). Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. (JB)
October 28, 2021 Filing 81 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#77 BNC Notice). No. of Notices: 81. Notice Date 10/28/2021. (Admin.)
October 28, 2021 Filing 80 Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing . Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (RE: related document(s)#76 Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing). (Brown, Ron)
October 28, 2021 Filing 79 Request for Entry of Order . Proposed Order emailed to chambers. (RE: related document(s)#56 Motion for Relief From Stay, Motion for Adequate Protection) Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Commercial Credit Group Inc.. (Bickle, Brandon)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (David L. Staab) (Related Doc #63). (JB)
October 26, 2021 Filing 77 Notice to BNC of Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing by Video Conference and Establishing Related Deadlines (RE: related document(s)#76 Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing). (JB)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing by Video Conference and Establishing Related Deadlines (RE: related document(s)#73 Motion to Dismiss Case). (JB)
October 26, 2021 Filing 75 District Court Receipt # : TOK051350. Amount: $100.00 Attorneys: David Staab and Frasher Murphy (RE: related document(s)#63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). (TS)
October 25, 2021 Filing 74 Memorandum of Document Deficiency to David Staab, regarding document number #64. The attorney signature on the document does not match the user in the electronic filing system, per Local Rule 9011-4(B). See also, the CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures XI. A. Correction due by 10/26/2021. (RE: related document(s)#64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). (TS)
October 25, 2021 Filing 73 Motion to Dismiss Case . Notice of Opportunity for Hearing: Written Response or Objection due within 14 days. If no response or objection is timely filed, the Court may grant the requested relief without hearing or further notice. Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brown, Ron)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order Partially Granting Equify Financial, LLC's Expedited Motion (I) for Entry of Agreed Order Lifting the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 4001(d) and Waiver of 14-Day Stay Under Bankruptcy Rule 4001(a)(3); and (II) to Shorten Notice Period (Related Doc #65). Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. (JB)
October 25, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE: Local Rule 9014-1(B) requires that any corporation that is a participant in a contested matter shall file a Corporate Ownership Statement on Local Form 7007.1-1. Corporate Ownership Statement due 11/1/2021. (RE: related document(s)#65 Motion for Relief From Stay, Motion to Extend or Shorten Time). (TS)
October 25, 2021 Filing 70 Notice of No Action Taken: On October 21,2021, David Staab filed a "NOTICE OF APPEARANCE UNDER BANKRUPTCY RULE 9010(b)AND REQUEST FOR ALL COPIES PURSUANT TO BANKRUPTCY RULE2002 AND ALL PLEADINGS PURSUANT TO BANKRUPTCY RULE 3017(a)" in this case. The pleading indicates that J. Frasher Murphy is an additional attorney of record for Equify Financial, LLC. According to Local Rule 9010-1 C, "An attorney appearing for a party in a case or adversary proceeding who desires to receive notices pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002(g) must file an entry of appearance requesting notices." (RE: related document(s)#62 Entry of Appearance). (TS)
October 22, 2021 Filing 69 MINUTE: Hearing regarding Equify Financial, LLC's Expedited Motion (I) For Entry of Agreed Order Lifting the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 4001(d) and Waiver of 14-day Stay Under Bankruptcy Rule 4001(a)(3); and to Shorten Notice Period filed at Docket No. 65 held on 10/22/2021. Partial relief to be granted by separate order. Amended motion to be filed. (RE: related document(s)#65 Motion for Relief From Stay, Motion to Extend or Shorten Time, 68 Order Setting Telephonic Hearing (Judge Michael)). (AB)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DIAL-IN HEARING. A Telephonic DIAL-IN Hearing shall be held on 10/22/2021 at 03:00 PM to consider Equify Financial, LLC's Expedited Motion (I) For Entry of Agreed Order Lifting the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 4001(d) and Waiver of 14-day Stay Under Bankruptcy Rule 4001(a)(3); and to Shorten Notice Period filed at Docket No. 65. Parties desiring to participate in this hearing shall DIAL-IN to the hearing, using the toll-free dial-in number of 888-684-8852 and the Access Code of 9298395#. BY THE COURT: Judge Terrence L. Michael (RE: related document(s)#65 Motion for Relief From Stay, Motion to Extend or Shorten Time). This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (text-only order). (AB)
October 22, 2021 Filing 67 Certificate of Service (related documents#65 Motion for Relief From Stay, Motion to Extend or Shorten Time) Certificate of Service attached. Filed by David Staab on behalf of Equify Financial, LLC. (Staab, David)
October 21, 2021 Filing 66 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(# 21-11056-M) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4478347. Fee amount 188.00 (Re: Doc#65). (U.S. Treasury)
October 21, 2021 Filing 65 Motion for Relief from Stay Motion (i) for Entry of Agreed Order Lifting the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 4001(d) and Waiver of 14-Day Stay Under Bankruptcy Rule 4001(a)(3); and (ii) to Shorten Notice Period. Fee Amount $188, Motion to Shorten Time .. Filed by David Staab on behalf of Equify Financial, LLC. (Staab, David)
October 21, 2021 Filing 64 Motion for J. Frasher Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by David Staab on behalf of Equify Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Staab, David)
October 21, 2021 Filing 63 Motion for David L. Staab to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by David Staab on behalf of Equify Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Staab, David)
October 21, 2021 Filing 62 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. for J. Frasher Murphy and David L. Staab of Haynes and Boone, LLP Certificate of Service attached. Filed by David Staab on behalf of Equify Financial, LLC. (Staab, David)
October 21, 2021 Filing 61 Meeting of Creditors. Debtors did not appear. Meeting continued to 11/18/21 at 1:30, dial 877-396-3133, access code 3698950# (RE: related document(s)#19 Meeting of Creditors 11). (Office of the United States Trustee)
October 20, 2021 Filing 60 Amended Schedule(s) A/B.Declaration. Fee Amount $0. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)) Reason for filing amendment or correction: amended to remove property owned by BVL Companies LLC. Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
October 19, 2021 Filing 59 Final Order of Court Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection (Related Doc #44). Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. (JB)
October 19, 2021 Filing 58 MINUTE: Hearing regarding Motion for Entry of Final Cash Collateral Order and Notice of Hearing and Objection Deadline held on 10/19/2021. Motion granted. Separate order to be entered. (RE: related document(s)#44 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #52 Order Setting Hearing). (AB)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE (SUBCHAPTER V): The status conference mandated by 11 U.S.C. 1188(a) shall be held on 11/9/2021 at 10:00 via telephonic DIAL-IN. Parties desiring to participate in the status conference hearing shall DIAL-IN to the hearing, using the toll-free dial-in number of 888-684-8852 and the Access Code of 9298395# . Debtor, Debtor's counsel, and the case trustee are required to appear. The Pre-Conference Status Report required by 11 U.S.C. 1188(c) shall be filed by Debtor on or before 10/26/2021 and served on all parties in interest. BY THE COURT: Judge Terrence L. Michael . This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (text-only order). (AB)
October 12, 2021 Filing 56 Amended Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $0.0, or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection . Notice of Opportunity for Hearing: Written Response or Objection due within 14 days. If no response or objection is timely filed, the Court may grant the requested relief without hearing or further notice. Reason for filing amendment or correction: add certificate of service. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Commercial Credit Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit H) (RE: related document(s)#54 Motion for Relief From Stay, Motion for Adequate Protection). (Bickle, Brandon)
October 8, 2021 Filing 55 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(# 21-11056-M) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4474786. Fee amount 188.00 (Re: Doc#54). (U.S. Treasury)
October 8, 2021 Filing 54 Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $188, or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection . Notice of Opportunity for Hearing: Written Response or Objection due within 14 days. If no response or objection is timely filed, the Court may grant the requested relief without hearing or further notice. Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Commercial Credit Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G) (Bickle, Brandon)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO EMPLOY BROWN LAW FIRM, P.C., AS ATTORNEY. The application is approved subject to the following: (1) This order is not a determination that the services are necessary; (2) No determination is made that the person or entity being employed does not represent an adverse interest; and (3) No fee agreement between the applicant and the person or entity being employed is binding on the Court. (Related Doc #5). Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. BY THE COURT: Judge Terrence L. Michael. (text-only order) This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (JB)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order Setting Hearing: Hearing scheduled 10/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom # 2, 1st Floor, 224 South Boulder Avenue, Tulsa OK 74103 to consider the Motion for Entry of Final Cash Collateral Order and Notice of Hearing and Objection Deadline. All participants in the hearing shall wear a mask at all times while inside The Federal Building. Further instructions governing this hearing are contained in the document attached hereto and are incorporated herein by this reference. BY THE COURT: Judge Terrence L. Michael (RE: related document(s)#44 Motion to Use Cash Collateral). (AB)
October 5, 2021 Filing 51 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by John W. Mee III on behalf of ARVEST BANK. (Mee, John)
October 5, 2021 Filing 50 Creditor Request for Notices. Filed by Ally Financial.(eRQN)
October 5, 2021 Filing 49 Creditor Request for Notices. Filed by Ally Financial.(eRQN)
October 5, 2021 Filing 48 Creditor Request for Notices. Filed by Ally Financial.(eRQN)
October 5, 2021 Filing 47 Creditor Request for Notices. Filed by Ally Financial.(eRQN)
October 5, 2021 Filing 46 Creditor Request for Notices. Filed by Ally Financial.(eRQN)
October 4, 2021 Filing 45 Certificate of Service (related documents#44 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brown, Ron)
October 4, 2021 Filing 44 Motion to Use Cash Collateral. (Entry of Final Cash Collateral Order) Notice of Opportunity for Hearing: Written Response or Objection due within 14 days. If no response or objection is timely filed, the Court may grant the requested relief without hearing or further notice. Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (RE: related document(s)#43 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief). (Brown, Ron)
October 1, 2021 Filing 43 Agreed Order Authorizing Interim Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Replacement Liens (Related Doc #15), (Related Doc #18). Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (JB)
October 1, 2021 Filing 42 MINUTE: Hearing held on 09/29/2021, 09/30/2021, and 10/01/2021 regarding Motion for Entry of Interim Cash Collateral Order and for Expedited Hearing (Docket No. 15); Objection by Commercial Credit Group Inc. (Docket No. 29) and Corrected Motion of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing the Debtor to (I) Pay Wages, Salaries, and Other Compensation and Maintain Benefits, (II) Pay Reimbursable Employee Expenses and (III) Approve Management Compensation and Request for Expedited Hearing (Docket No. 18). Evidence received. Agreed order to be entered. Final Hearing regarding the use of cash collateral scheduled for October 19, 2021. (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #18 Miscellaneous Relief, #21 Order Setting Hearing, #29 Objection, 40 Minute Order). (AB)
October 1, 2021 Filing 41 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Kiran Phansalkar on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers Local 627, Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 627 Training Trust, Trustees of the South Central Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Oklahoma Operating Engineers Welfare Plan, Michael Crabtree, as Chief Executive Officer of the Central Pension Fund of the International Union of Operating Engineers and Participating Employers. (Phansalkar, Kiran)
September 30, 2021 Filing 40 Minute Order: Hearing regarding 1) Motion for Entry of Interim Cash Collateral Order and for Expedited Hearing (Docket No. 15); Objection by Commercial Credit Group Inc. (Docket No. 29); and 2) Corrected Motion of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing the Debtor to (I) Pay Wages, Salaries, and Other Compensation and Maintain Benefits, (II) Pay Reimbursable Employee Expenses and (III) Approve Management Compensation and Request for Expedited Hearing (Docket No. 18) will reconvene on October 1, 2021, at 1:00 PM via telephonic dial-in. Parties desiring to participate in this hearing shall DIAL-IN to the hearing using the toll-free dial-in number of 888-684-8852 and the Access Code of 9298395 BY THE COURT: Judge Terrence L. Michael (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #18 Miscellaneous Relief, #21 Order Setting Hearing, #29 Objection). This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (text-only order). (AB)
September 30, 2021 Filing 39 Initial Report of Debtor-in-Possession Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 28, 2021 Filing 38 Certificate of Service via US Mail to Allsteel Transport, LLC, 359071 US Hwy 62, Paden, OK 74860 (RE: related document(s) 37 Memorandum of Document Deficiency). (NC)
September 28, 2021 Filing 37 Memorandum of Document Deficiency to Allsteel Transport, LLC regarding claim number 5. Pursuant to LR 9004-1, documents filed in a case shall be formatted to be 8-1/2 inches wide by 11 inches long, shall be in no less than 12 point font, shall have margins of no less than one inch, and shall be drawn upon one side of the page only. An amended Official Form 410 (Proof of Claim) document should be submitted. Correction due by 10/5/2021. (NC)
September 28, 2021 Filing 36 Exhibit List. (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #21 Order Setting Hearing), Witness List. (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #21 Order Setting Hearing) Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 28, 2021 Filing 35 Brief -in-Support of Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-PSA #2 Exhibit 2-CFI UCC #3 Exhibit 3-MSA #4 Exhibit 4-LCF UCC) (Brown, Ron)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc #27). (JB)
September 27, 2021 Filing 33 Corporate Ownership Statement. (RE: related document(s) 30 Deficiency re: Corporate Ownership Statement) Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Commercial Credit Group Inc.. (Bickle, Brandon)
September 27, 2021 Filing 32 Corporate Ownership Statement. Corporate parents added to case:Commercial Credit, Inc.. (RE: related document(s) 30 Deficiency re: Corporate Ownership Statement) Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Commercial Funding Inc.. (Bickle, Brandon)
September 27, 2021 Filing 31 Witness List. (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #21 Order Setting Hearing, #29 Objection), Exhibit List. (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #21 Order Setting Hearing, #29 Objection) Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Commercial Credit Group Inc., Commercial Funding Inc.. (Bickle, Brandon)
September 27, 2021 Filing 30 (CURED, SEE #32) NOTICE: Local Rule 9014-1(B) requires that any corporation that is a participant in a contested matter shall file a Corporate Ownership Statement on Local Form 7007.1-1. Corporate Ownership Statement due 10/4/2021. (RE: related document(s)#29 Objection). (ES)(Modified by TS)
September 27, 2021 Filing 29 Objection to #15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral . Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Commercial Credit Group Inc., Commercial Funding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D) (Bickle, Brandon)
September 27, 2021 Filing 28 District Court Receipt # : TOK051122. Amount: 50.00 Attorney: David L Kane (RE: related document(s)#27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). (ES)
September 27, 2021 Filing 27 Motion for David L. Kane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Commercial Credit Group Inc., Commercial Funding Inc.. (Bickle, Brandon)
September 22, 2021 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#19 Meeting of Creditors 11). No. of Notices: 64. Notice Date 09/22/2021. (Admin.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 25 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of Commercial Credit Group Inc., Commercial Funding Inc.. (Bickle, Brandon)
September 21, 2021 Filing 24 Certificate of Service (related documents#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #18 Miscellaneous Relief, #21 Order Setting Hearing) Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 21, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Service (related documents#22 Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim) Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Matrix) (Brown, Ron)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claims. Proofs of Claims due by 11/1/2021. (RE: related document(s)#11 Miscellaneous Relief). Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. (B, Jo)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Setting Expedited Hearing and Directing Notice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. (RE: related document(s)#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #18 Miscellaneous Relief). (B, Adam)
September 20, 2021 Filing 20 Corrected Declaration re: . (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)) Reason for filing amendment or correction: corrected to check appropriate schedules on the form. Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 20, 2021 Filing 19 Meeting of Creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/21/2021 at 01:30 PM in lieu of in person, via telephone using the phone number and access code in the Ch. 11 Notice. Deadline to object to dischargeability of certain debts: 12/20/2021. (S, Erin)
September 20, 2021 Filing 18 Corrected Motion OF THE DEBTOR FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO (I) PAY WAGES, SALARIES, AND OTHER COMPENSATION AND MAINTAIN BENEFITS, (II) PAY REIMBURSABLE EMPLOYEE EXPENSES AND (III) APPROVE MANAGEMENT COMPENSATION Reason for filing amendment or correction: corrected filing to include case number. Request for EXPEDITED Hearing. Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER STRIKING MOTION OF THE DEBTOR FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO (I) PAY WAGES, SALARIES, AND OTHER COMPENSATION AND MAINTAIN BENEFITS, (II) PAY REIMBURSABLE EMPLOYEE EXPENSES AND (III) APPROVE MANAGEMENT COMPENSATION AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING. THIS MATTER comes before the Court on its own motion. On 9/19/2021, a MOTION OF THE DEBTOR FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO (I) PAY WAGES, SALARIES, AND OTHER COMPENSATION AND MAINTAIN BENEFITS, (II) PAY REIMBURSABLE EMPLOYEE EXPENSES AND (III) APPROVE MANAGEMENT COMPENSATION AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING was filed in this case at Docket No. #14. Said pleading does not indicate the case number associated with the pleading. The Court identifies pleadings by case number. Since the pleading found at Docket No. #14 does not contain a case number, it shall be stricken. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the MOTION OF THE DEBTOR FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO (I) PAY WAGES, SALARIES, AND OTHER COMPENSATION AND MAINTAIN BENEFITS, (II) PAY REIMBURSABLE EMPLOYEE EXPENSES AND (III) APPROVE MANAGEMENT COMPENSATION AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING filed in this case at Docket No. #14, be, and the same hereby is, stricken. BY THE COURT: Judge Terrence L. Michael (RE: related document(s)#14 Miscellaneous Relief). This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (text-only order). (B, Adam)
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice to Ron Brown, regarding document number #10, #11, #14. The debtor's name on filed pleading does not match the debtor's name in this case. The Clerk's Office will take no further action. (RE: related document(s)#10 Equity Security Holders, #11 Miscellaneous Relief, #14 Miscellaneous Relief). (S, Erin)
September 19, 2021 Filing 15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Request for EXPEDITED Hearing. Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brown, Ron)
September 19, 2021 Filing 14 STRICKEN, SEE #17 Motion OF THE DEBTOR FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO (I) PAY WAGES, SALARIES, AND OTHER COMPENSATION AND MAINTAIN BENEFITS, (II) PAY REIMBURSABLE EMPLOYEE EXPENSES AND (III) APPROVE MANAGEMENT COMPENSATION Request for EXPEDITED Hearing. Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brown, Ron)(Modified by S, Erin)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. Trustee Stephen John Moriarty added to the case. 341(a) meeting is to be scheduled on October 21, 2021 at 1:30 PM in in lieu of in person, via telephone using 877-396-3133, Access Code 3698950#. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee) (Office of the United States Trustee) Modified on 9/20/2021 to correct telephone number and access code.(Frisch, Susan).
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 (CURED, SEE #20) NOTICE OF INCOMPLETE FILING: Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors on page 5 does not include any checked documents to indicate what documents were examined. Failure to file these documents within 14 days of the filing date of the petition may constitute cause for dismissal. Correction due by 9/30/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (C, Natalie)(Modified by S, Erin)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to set Proof of Claim Deadline Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 Equity Security Holders Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 (CURED, SEE #10) NOTICE OF INCOMPLETE FILING: List of Equity Security Holders not filed. Failure to file these documents within 14 days of the filing date of the petition may constitute cause for dismissal. Correction due by 9/30/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (C, Natalie)(Modified by S, Erin)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Corrective Entry: Edited docket text to correct the name and official form number of document. (RE: related document(s)#4 Attachment to Ch 11 Voluntary Petition). (C, Natalie)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Filed by Karen Walsh on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee. (Walsh, Karen)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Filed by Paul R. Thomas on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee. (Thomas, Paul)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to Employ Brown Law Firm PC as Attorney for Estate . Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy under Chapter 11 - Form 201A Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Ownership Statement. Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc.. (Brown, Ron)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-11056) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 4467241. Fee amount 1738.00 (Re: Doc#1). (U.S. Treasury)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount Due: $1738. Fee Amount Paid: $1738. Filed by Ron D. Brown on behalf of Lambrix Crane Service Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D). (Brown, Ron)

Search for this case: Lambrix Crane Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Lambrix Crane Service Inc.
Represented By: Ron D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the United States Trustee
Represented By: Paul R. Thomas
Represented By: Karen Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Stephen John Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?