Fletcher, et al v. USA, et al
Case Number: 4:2002cv00427
Filed: May 31, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Presiding Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1400 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; denying 1353 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 1353 Motion for Costs (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 1285 Motion to Alter Order/Judgment; granting in part 1289 Motion to Alter Order/Judgment (Re: 1280 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion to Strike Document(s) ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1280 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting in part and denying in part 1265 Motion to Strike Document(s) (pll, Dpty Clk)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 1148 Motion to Certify Class (hbo, Dpty Clk)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Amended (Re: 1162 Opinion and Order,, Dismissing/Terminating Case,, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss,, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 1126 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; dismissing/terminating case ; granting 1126 Motion to Dismiss; granting 1126 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Documents Terminated: 1147 MOTION to Bifurcate, 1157 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order, 1148 MOTION to Certify Class ) (GKF1, Chambers)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating party T Benedum ; granting 995 Motion to Dismiss (Re: 79 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss,, ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Ken Salazar is substituted for Dirk Kempthorne as defendant Secretary of the Interior; Plaintiffs are granted leave to file, within fifteen days hereof, a Second Amended Complaint ; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss (JLE, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fletcher, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?