Brooks v. Newton-Embry et al
Petitioner: Tammy Renee Brooks
Respondent: Millicent Newton-Embry and Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma
Case Number: 4:2010cv00072
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan that the petition for writ of habeas corpus (Dkt. # 1) is time-barred and is dismissed with prejudice. (Re: 1 ) (RGG, Chambers)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; directing Petitioner to show cause( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/4/2010); denying 11 Motion to Dismiss (Re: 1 ) (RGG, Chambers)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING 5 Report and Recommendation, TRANSFERRING case to USDC NDOK. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/3/10. (llg) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/4/2010.]
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma pursuant to 28 USC 2241(d). 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tammy Renee Brooks. Petitione r is advised of her right to object to this R&R. Within 14 days after being served w/a copy of this R&R, Petitioner may serve and file specific written objections with the Clk of Court. This R&R disposes of all issues referred by the District Judge in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie K. Couch on 1/19/2010. (ch, ) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 2/4/2010.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Newton-Embry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tammy Renee Brooks
Represented By: James Carter Linger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Millicent Newton-Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?