Arena Football One, LLC v. Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Arena Football One, LLC
Defendant: Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv00118
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Presiding Judge: T Lane Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2010 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number 38 ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
December 21, 2010 Filing 38 STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Arena Football One, LLC, Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Strange, Adam)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Upon advice of settlement ; finding as moot 22 Motion to Amend (GKFJ, Judge)
October 18, 2010 Filing 36 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT by Adjunct Judge James W. Tilly advising litigation was settled, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 10/28/2010) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (crp, Dpty Clk)
October 7, 2010 Filing 34 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2010 ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting 32 Motion for Protective Order (Re: 32 Joint MOTION for Protective Order ) (Court Reporter: C1) (crp, Dpty Clk)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson a telephone conference is scheduled for 10/7/10 at 9:30 a.m. The Court will initiate phone conference., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2010 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson) (Re: 32 Joint MOTION for Protective Order ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
October 5, 2010 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Arena Football One, LLC, Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (With attachments) (Strange, Adam)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary Rescheduling Settlement Conference ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ James W. Tilly ( Settlement Conference set for 10/18/2010 at 11:00 AM before Adjunct Judge); granting 29 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell, referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge Cleary (Re: 29 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
September 22, 2010 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Esmond, Michael)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary Rescheduling Settlement Conference ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ James W. Tilly ( Settlement Conference set for 10/6/2010 at 11:00 AM before Adjunct Judge); granting 27 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 25, 2010 ***Motion(s) Referred to Magistrate Cleary (Re: 27 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
August 25, 2010 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Esmond, Michael)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ James W. Tilly ( Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2010 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Judge) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2010 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 22 First MOTION to Amend Pleadings ) by Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC ; (Rooney, John)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell, setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 3/31/2011, Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2011, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/25/2011, Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 8/15/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell), setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 7/11/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
July 21, 2010 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 22 First MOTION to Amend Pleadings ) by Arena Football One, LLC ; (Vogt, Thomas)
July 16, 2010 Filing 22 First MOTION to Amend Pleadings (Re: 15 Answer, 18 Amended Counterclaim ) by Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Rooney, John)
July 16, 2010 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: Not all filers were selected when filed; Correction: Edited docket text and added filer (Re: 21 Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 ) (lml, Dpty Clk)
July 15, 2010 Filing 21 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Arena Football One, LLC, Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Strange, Adam) Modified on 7/16/2010 to add filer (lml, Dpty Clk).
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell, directing parties to file joint status report( Status Report due by 7/15/2010) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
June 18, 2010 Filing 19 ANSWER (Re: 18 Amended Counterclaim ) by Arena Football One, LLC (Strange, Adam)
June 4, 2010 Filing 18 First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Arena Football One, LLC (Re: 16 Counterclaim ) by Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Esmond, Michael)
May 14, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER (Re: 16 Counterclaim ) by Arena Football One, LLC (Vogt, Thomas)
April 26, 2010 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: Document No. 15 is a multi-event document, but only one event (Answer) was filed; Correction: Filed the second event (Counterclaim) as Document No. 16 (Re: 15 Answer, 16 Counterclaim ) (lml, Dpty Clk)
April 23, 2010 Filing 16 COUNTERCLAIM against Arena Football One, LLC by Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (SUBMITTED AS DOC # 15 ) (lml, Dpty Clk)
April 23, 2010 Filing 15 ANSWER (Re: 2 Complaint ) by Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Esmond, Michael) Modified on 4/26/2010-This is a multi-event document; See Doc #16 for Counterclaim (lml, Dpty Clk).
April 9, 2010 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Ellis Esmond on behalf of Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Esmond, Michael)
April 9, 2010 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within five (5) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (s-srl, Dpty Clk)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: 2 Complaint ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
April 7, 2010 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrick Dennis O'Connor on behalf of Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (O'Connor, Patrick)
April 7, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: 2 Complaint ) by Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Rooney, John)
April 7, 2010 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Rooney, John)
April 7, 2010 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Edward Rooney, Jr on behalf of Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Rooney, John)
March 30, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (Re: 2 Complaint ) by Arena Football One, LLC (Vogt, Thomas)
March 16, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (sjm, Dpty Clk)
March 1, 2010 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arena Football One, LLC (Strange, Adam)
February 25, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (s-srl, Dpty Clk)
February 25, 2010 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Arena Football One, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within five (5) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (sjm, Dpty Clk)
February 25, 2010 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC (paid $350 filing fee; receipt number 10850000000000669786) by Arena Football One, LLC (Strange, Adam)
February 25, 2010 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Arena Football One, LLC (Strange, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arena Football One, LLC v. Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arena Football One, LLC
Represented By: Thomas L Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arena2 of Arkansas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?