United States of America, The v. Spencer et al
Plaintiff: United States of America, The
Defendant: Anthony L Spencer and Patrick G Walters
Case Number: 4:2010cv00229
Filed: April 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; denying 88 Motion to Reconsider; denying 88 Motion to Certify (vah, Chambers)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2013, Nonjury Trial set for 1/22/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern); granting 77 Motion to Strike (vah, Chambers)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Jury Trial set for 1/22/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern); granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 44 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Summary Judgment (vah, Chambers)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Striking Pretrial and Trial. the United States shall be permitted to file a supplemental brief addressing these issues no later than 10/17/12; and Def. Walters shall be permitted to file a supplemental response brief no later than 10/26/12., striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (vah, Chambers)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern Dismissing Patrick G. Walters' Counterclaim ; granting 27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (vah, Chambers)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; denying 7 Motion to Dismiss (vah, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, The v. Spencer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, The
Represented By: Robert Eugene Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony L Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick G Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?