Wright v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: James E Wright
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv00024
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2016 195 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell ; granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion in Limine (Re: 2 Complaint ) (SAS, Chambers)
April 22, 2016 191 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell denying BNSF's Motion in Limine on Other Injury Claims (Doc. 124) and BNSF's Specific Motions in Limine on Medical Expenses and Post-Termination Lost Wages and Brief in Support (Doc. 125). ; denying 124 Motion in Limine; denying 125 Motion in Limine (Re: 2 Complaint ) (SAS, Chambers)
April 1, 2016 184 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell ; denying 127 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 154 Motion for Sanctions; denying 155 Motion to Strike Document(s) (lml, Dpty Clk)
March 28, 2016 179 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell ; granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion in Limine; denying 128 Motion in Limine (Re: 2 Complaint ) (SAS, Chambers)
October 19, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; denying 105 Motion to Compel (tjc, Dpty Clk)
July 23, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting 95 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (tjc, Dpty Clk)
September 15, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Re: 44 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Notice to Take Video Deposition ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Wright
Represented By: Joseph L. Bauer, Jr.
Represented By: Edwin L Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: George Eldon Gibbs
Represented By: George R Mullican
Represented By: Jamie Alison Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?