Price et al v. Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Plaintiff: Steve A Price, Bobby L Erwin, John Harn, Clayton Naugle, Cody R Harper, Ronny D Thompson, Jordan Janz, Jason S Hughes, Corbin Rowe, Dean Franklin, Wesley B Goss, James B Speer, Randall D Thompson, Brad Crain, Desmon Jeffords, Brandon Brown, Jon E Ondracek, Kevin R Domres, William A Schenk, Charles L Bunch, Chad Cummings, Larry D Hale, Jason W Harrison, Stephen D Lane, Clinton Leigh, Mark Mulliniks, Lucus T Purcell, Brandon Robertson, Luther Shockley, Shawn Clay Stocum, Charles Tatum, Ronald J Serrata, Joseph D Baker, Kevin Gable, Gary F Semke and Aaron Lakey
Defendant: Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Case Number: 4:2013cv00514
Filed: August 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Presiding Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 189 Motion for Summary Judgment (hbo, Dpty Clk)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; denying 195 Motion to Compel (tjc, Dpty Clk)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; striking/withdrawing document(s); granting 76 Motion to Strike Document(s); denying 78 Motion to Strike Document(s); denying 79 Motion to Strike Document(s) (Re: 61 Notice of Consent(s) to Join ) (Documents Terminated: 61 Notice of Consent(s) to Join ) (hbo, Dpty Clk)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendant objection is overruled ; rejecting 81 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order (hbo, Dpty Clk) Modified on 8/12/2014 (hbo, Dpty Clk)to correct type of order.
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; denying 60 Motion for Protective Order (tjc, Dpty Clk)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss (hbo, Dpty Clk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price et al v. Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve A Price
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby L Erwin
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harn
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Naugle
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody R Harper
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny D Thompson
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Janz
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason S Hughes
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corbin Rowe
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Franklin
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley B Goss
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B Speer
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall D Thompson
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Crain
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmon Jeffords
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Brown
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon E Ondracek
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin R Domres
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Schenk
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L Bunch
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Cummings
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D Hale
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason W Harrison
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen D Lane
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Leigh
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mulliniks
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucus T Purcell
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Robertson
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Shockley
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Clay Stocum
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Tatum
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J Serrata
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph D Baker
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Gable
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary F Semke
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Lakey
Represented By: George S Freedman
Represented By: James Collins Hodges
Represented By: Shanann Pinkham Passley
Represented By: Robert Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Service Company of Oklahoma
Represented By: Jon E Brightmire
Represented By: Kristen Lee Brightmire
Represented By: Courtney L Bru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?