Unit Petroleum Company v. Veitch et al
Plaintiff: Unit Petroleum Company
Defendant: William A Veitch, Ashley Tumelson, Steven Simonyi-Gindele and KT Capital Corp.
Intervenor_defendant: Petrohunter Energy, Inc.
Counter_claimant: William A Veitch and Petrohunter Energy, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Unit Petroleum Company
Cross_claimant: William A Veitch, Petrohunter Energy, Inc. and KT Capital Corp.
Cross_defendant: KT Capital Corp., Steven Simonyi-Gindele, Ashley Tumelson and William A Veitch
Case Number: 4:2014cv00105
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Presiding Judge: T Lane Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan directing the parties to submit an agreed judgment no later than 10/21/15 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/21/2015); granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for Attorney Fees (Re: 150 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses ) (RGG, Chambers)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the Motion of William A. Veitch for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Ownership of Petrohunter Energy, Inc. and Related Properties and Brief in Support (Dkt. # 119) is denied; KT Capital and St even Simonyi-Gindele's Joint Motion and Brief for Partial Summary Judgment Adjudication Regarding Ownership of Petrohunter Energy, Inc. (Dkt. # 120) is granted insofar as the Court finds that KT Capital Corp. is the owner of Petrohunter. N o later than January 22, 2015, the parties shall file a status report as to what, if any, issues remain for adjudication by this Court after entry of this Opinion and Order, what bankruptcy issues would preclude the immediate distribution of funds to KT, and the status of the funds received by Veitch from the Treasurer of Oklahoma. ; denying 119 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 120 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Re: 27 Order,, Ruling on Motion to Intervene, 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that Petrohunter's amended answer and Veitch's second amended answer are due no later than August 1, 2014. ; granting 84 Motion to Amend; granting 85 Motion to Amend (Re: 28 Answer, 27 Order,, Ruling on Motion to Intervene, 47 Amended Answer, 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unit Petroleum Company v. Veitch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unit Petroleum Company
Represented By: Chad J Kutmas
Represented By: Gary Michael McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A Veitch
Represented By: John Edward Howland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Tumelson
Represented By: John Edward Howland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Simonyi-Gindele
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KT Capital Corp.
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Petrohunter Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: John Edward Howland
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: William A Veitch
Represented By: John Edward Howland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Petrohunter Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: John Edward Howland
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Unit Petroleum Company
Represented By: Chad J Kutmas
Represented By: Gary Michael McDonald
Represented By: Chad J Kutmas
Represented By: Gary Michael McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: William A Veitch
Represented By: John Edward Howland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Petrohunter Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: John Edward Howland
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: KT Capital Corp.
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: KT Capital Corp.
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Steven Simonyi-Gindele
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Represented By: Ronnie Jack Freeman
Represented By: Phyllis Gae Widdows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ashley Tumelson
Represented By: John Edward Howland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: William A Veitch
Represented By: John Edward Howland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?