Salmon v. CRST Expedited, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Caleb Matthew Salmon
Defendant: CRST Expedited, Inc, 866-609-8026 John Doe, Darick Patterson, Alan Turnquist, Alicia Croker/Turnquist, Software Success, LLC, 256-970-2626 John Doe, 321-332-1516 John Doe, 314-669-2629 John Doe, 319-313-4308 John Doe, 408-214-2996 John Doe, 512-000-0001 John Doe, "7472893797@mymetropcs.com" John Doe, "ed@stu4give.com" John Doe, 631-789-6664 John Doe and "bc-advice.com" John Doe
Case Number: 4:2014cv00265
Filed: May 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Presiding Judge: T Lane Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. # 127) is accepted, and Defendant Nutra Pharma Corp.'s Amended Motion for Sanctions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 (Dkt. # 113) is granted in part and denied in part. NPC's request for attorney fees in the amount of $8,350 is denied, but NPC is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $3,000. Plaintiff is required to speak to students at the University of Tulsa C ollege of Law about the dangers of filing a lawsuit as a licensed legal intern. Plaintiff shall submit to the magistrate judge a draft letter to be sent to the Dean of the University of Tulsa College of Law no later than August 9, 2016. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 8/9/2016); granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion for Sanctions; accepting 127 Report and Recommendation (RGG, Chambers)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that Defendant Nutra Pharma Corp.'s Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 11 (Dkt. # 86) is granted, and Defendant Nutra Pharma Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss and Brief in S upport (Dkt. # 91) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 107) is denied. Nutra Pharma Corp. is directed to file an amended motion for sanctions with all attorney time and billing records no later than January 19, 2016. The amended motion for sanctions will be referred to Magistrate Judge T. Lane Wilson for a hearing. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/19/2016); terminating party Nutra Pharma Corp. ; granting 86 Motion for Sanctions; granting 91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 107 Motion to Reconsider (Re: 49 Amended Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers) Modified on 1/4/2016 to correct year to 2016 (srt, Dpty Clk).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that all remaining deadlines in the scheduling order (Dkt. # 26), including the 3/31/15 pretrial conference and the 4/13/15 jury trial, stricken. An amended scheduling order will be entered, if ne cessary, following the Court's ruling on Nutra's motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 91) ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); terminating party CRST Expedited, Inc ; granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 61 Motio n for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 67 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 68 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 69 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 70 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 72 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 73 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 75 Motion to Strike; denying 99 Motion to Sever (Re: 49 Amended Complaint, 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 35 Motion to Sever; denying 37 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan directing defendant Alicia Croker to file her answer to the complaint 2 no later than 10/1/14 ; denying 22 Motion to Dismiss (Re: 2 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salmon v. CRST Expedited, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Matthew Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Expedited, Inc
Represented By: Stuart Douglas Campbell
Represented By: Matthew L Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 866-609-8026 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darick Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Turnquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Croker/Turnquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Software Success, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 256-970-2626 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 321-332-1516 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 314-669-2629 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 319-313-4308 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 408-214-2996 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 512-000-0001 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "7472893797@mymetropcs.com" John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "ed@stu4give.com" John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 631-789-6664 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "bc-advice.com" John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?