Lynch v. Malloy et al

Appellant: Stephen Nicholas Lynch
Appellee: Patrick J Malloy, III, Robert B Sartin, C Robert Burton, IV, Kleinco Residential Construction, LLC, Kenneth K Klein, Judi Klein, Kristin Klein Daffern, BOKF, N.A., CFR, INC., Westport Insurance Corporation, Bruce A McKenna, Christopher Pettet, Valerie Mitchell, District Court in for Osage County, Oklahoma, District Court for Tulsa County, Oklahoma, Steven W Soule, Eric M Daffern, Scott F Lehman and Terrence L Michael
Case Number: 4:2015cv00364
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Referring Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; denying 51 Motion for Sanctions (tjc, Dpty Clk)
January 19, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; setting/resetting bankruptcy appeal briefing deadline(s): ( Appellees Brief due by 2/16/2016, Appellants Reply Brief due by 3/8/2016); denying 58 Motion to Dismiss; denyi ng 60 Motion to Stay; denying 61 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying 63 Motion to Dismiss; denying 65 Motion to Dismiss; denying 66 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s); denying 67 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; denying 68 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; denying 69 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; denying 70 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (tjc, Dpty Clk)
November 23, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; finding as moot 46 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s); granting 48 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
October 13, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; finding as moot 18 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 20 Motion to Stay; denying 6 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 14 Motion to Stay (tjc, Dpty Clk)
August 13, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 8/27/2015, Replies due by 9/4/2015); granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion; granting 34 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: 14 MOTION to Stay Appeal Pending Bankruptcy Court's Ruling on Motions to Impose Sanctions Against Appellant's Counsel, Marth Hyde ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. Malloy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephen Nicholas Lynch
Represented By: Martha L Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Patrick J Malloy, III
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Malloy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert B Sartin
Represented By: Dustin Lynn Perry
Represented By: Robert Bradley Sartin
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: C Robert Burton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kleinco Residential Construction, LLC
Represented By: Dustin Lynn Perry
Represented By: Robert Bradley Sartin
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kenneth K Klein
Represented By: Dustin Lynn Perry
Represented By: Robert Bradley Sartin
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Judi Klein
Represented By: Dustin Lynn Perry
Represented By: Robert Bradley Sartin
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kristin Klein Daffern
Represented By: Dustin Lynn Perry
Represented By: Robert Bradley Sartin
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BOKF, N.A.
Represented By: John Daniel Clayman
Represented By: Jean Michael Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CFR, INC.
Represented By: Bruce Alvin McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Westport Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Bruce Alvin McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bruce A McKenna
Represented By: Bruce Alvin McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christopher Pettet
Represented By: Ryan Todd Scharnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Valerie Mitchell
Represented By: Ryan Todd Scharnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: District Court in for Osage County, Oklahoma
Represented By: Dixie Lynn Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: District Court for Tulsa County, Oklahoma
Represented By: Dixie Lynn Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steven W Soule
Represented By: Dustin Lynn Perry
Represented By: Robert Bradley Sartin
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Eric M Daffern
Represented By: Dustin Lynn Perry
Represented By: Robert Bradley Sartin
Represented By: Steven William Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Scott F Lehman
Represented By: John Daniel Clayman
Represented By: Jean Michael Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Terrence L Michael
Represented By: Wyn Dee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?