Garrett v. Tymkovech et al

Plaintiff: Shirley Dionne Garrett
Defendant: Monroe G McKay, Mary Briscoe, Gregory Phillips, Paul Kelly, Robert E Bocharoch, John C Erofilio, Stephanie Seymour, Timothy Tymkovech, Lotus, Nancy L Moritz, Jerome Holmes, Harry Hartz, Scott M Matheson, Carolyn McHugh, Jeff Sessions, Dorthan Eagle, David M Ebel, Michael Murphy, Bobby Balvock, Terrance Brien, Carlos Lucero and Jay Hare
Case Number: 4:2018cv00367
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Nowata
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Motion to Supplement); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Supplement) (Re: #8 SUPPLEMENT ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , action against Defendants is barred by absolute judicial immunity; action is barred by res judicata; and, Plaintiff has failed to properly serve Defendants. ) by United States of America (With attachments) (Zintgraff, Rachael) Modified on 8/16/2018 to change text to reflect correct event (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Judge Claire V Eagan. Judge Terence Kern reassigned to case., changing case number to 18-CV-367-TCK-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , action against Defendants is barred by absolute judicial immunity; action is barred by res judicata; and, Plaintiff has failed to properly serve Defendants. by Bobby Balvock, Robert E Bocharoch, Terrance Brien, Mary Briscoe, David M Ebel, John C Erofilio, Harry Hartz, Jerome Holmes, Paul Kelly, Carlos Lucero, Scott M Matheson, Carolyn McHugh, Monroe G McKay, Nancy L Moritz, Michael Murphy, Gregory Phillips, Jeff Sessions, Stephanie Seymour, Timothy Tymkovech (With attachments) (Zintgraff, Rachael)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Bobby Balvock, Robert E Bocharoch, Terrance Brien, Mary Briscoe, David M Ebel, John C Erofilio, Harry Hartz, Jerome Holmes, Paul Kelly, Carlos Lucero, Scott M Matheson, Carolyn McHugh, Monroe G McKay, Nancy L Moritz, Michael Murphy, Gregory Phillips, Jeff Sessions, Stephanie Seymour, Timothy Tymkovech (Zintgraff, Rachael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court in and For Nowata County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2018-16 by Bobby Balvock, Robert E Bocharoch, Terrance Brien, Mary Briscoe, David M Ebel, John C Erofilio, Harry Hartz, Jerome Holmes, Paul Kelly, Carlos Lucero, Scott M Matheson, Carolyn McHugh, Monroe G McKay, Nancy L Moritz, Michael Murphy, Gregory Phillips, Jeff Sessions, Stephanie Seymour, Timothy Tymkovech (Zintgraff, Rachael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bobby Balvock, Robert E Bocharoch, Terrance Brien, Mary Briscoe, David M Ebel, John C Erofilio, Harry Hartz, Jerome Holmes, Paul Kelly, Carlos Lucero, Scott M Matheson, Carolyn McHugh, Monroe G McKay, Nancy L Moritz, Michael Murphy, Gregory Phillips, Jeff Sessions, Stephanie Seymour, Timothy Tymkovech (Zintgraff, Rachael)
March 1, 2018 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Shirley Dionne Garrett (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Tymkovech et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe G McKay
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Briscoe
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Phillips
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kelly
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Bocharoch
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Erofilio
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Seymour
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Tymkovech
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lotus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L Moritz
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Holmes
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Hartz
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott M Matheson
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn McHugh
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorthan Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Ebel
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murphy
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Balvock
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Brien
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Lucero
Represented By: Rachael Faye Zintgraff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Dionne Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?