Patterson v. Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma et al

Plaintiff: Craig Patterson and Sheilah Patterson
Defendant: Jane Phillips Superintendent and Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma
Case Number: 4:2018cv00396
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Washington
0 Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
1 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
2 Judge: James H Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emilyn Ann Potter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Potter, Emilyn)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 Redacted AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs (Re: #10 Amended Complaint, ) by Sheilah Patterson, Craig Patterson (Potter, Emilyn)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma, Jane Phillips Superintendent (With attachments) (Dixon, Cheryl)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 SEALED UNREDACTED version of Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Sheilah Patterson, Craig Patterson (jln, Dpty Clk) Modified on 9/25/2018 to seal due to personal identifiers (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint due 9/24/2018; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due 10/10/2018) ; finding as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss Party; finding as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #5 Motion to Strike Document(s); granting #5 Motion to Substitute Party; denying #5 Motion for Hearing (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case. Defendant(s) have filed a Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #4 ] which should first be resolved. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk at the direction of Judge James H Payne, randomly reassigning this case, reassigning case to Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Judge James H Payne no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 18-CV-396-GKF-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Re: #5 MOTION to Strike Document(s) MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Hearing (Scheduling Conference) (Filed in State Court) ) by Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma, Jane Phillips Superintendent ; (Dixon, Cheryl)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma, Jane Phillips Superintendent (Dixon, Cheryl)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from District Court of Washington County, case number CJ-2018-81 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1943245) by Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma, Jane Phillips Superintendent (With attachments) (Dixon, Cheryl) Modified on 9/25/2018 to seal attachment due to personal identifiers (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma, Jane Phillips Superintendent (Dixon, Cheryl)
July 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike Document(s) , MOTION to Substitute Party , MOTION for Hearing (Scheduling Conference) (Filed in State Court) (Re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Party Jane Phillips Superintendent MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Filed in State Court) ) by Craig Patterson, Sheilah Patterson (jln, Dpty Clk)
July 9, 2018 Amended PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Sheilah Patterson, Craig Patterson (jln, Dpty Clk)
June 25, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss Party Jane Phillips Superintendent , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Filed in State Court) by Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma, Jane Phillips Superintendent (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Phillips Superintendent
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent School District No. 30 of Washington County, Oklahoma
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Patterson
Represented By: Jennifer Heflin
Represented By: Emilyn Ann Arbital
Represented By: Emilyn Ann Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheilah Patterson
Represented By: Jennifer Heflin
Represented By: Emilyn Ann Arbital
Represented By: Emilyn Ann Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?