Doe v. Hunter et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: United States of America, The, Michael J Hunter, Mary Fallin, United States Department of Justice and Jefferson B Sessions, III
Case Number: 4:2018cv00408
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants Fallin's and Hunter's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 12) is granted. The twenty-one (21) day response time will begin once all Defendants have filed answers to the Complaint. ; granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Jane Doe (Nunley, Daniel)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing (Doc. 3) is granted. Attorney Kristine L. Brown may appear in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff. Ms. Brown is directed to submit a CM-ECF Registration Form, which is available on the Court's website under the forms link, if she wishes to receive electronic notices. ; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 Amended CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Mary Fallin, Michael J Hunter (Velchik, Michael)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service (Re: #7 Appearance - Attorney, ) by Mary Fallin, Michael J Hunter (Velchik, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mary Fallin, Michael J Hunter (Velchik, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Kennth Velchik on behalf of Mary Fallin, Michael J Hunter [Note: Attorney Michael Kennth Velchik added to party Mary Fallin(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Kennth Velchik added to party Michael J Hunter(pty:dft).] (Velchik, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (submitted as part of #2 ) by Jane Doe (sac-qc, Dpty Clk)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to file and proceed anonymously (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jane Doe (Nunley, Daniel)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kristine L. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1945640) by Jane Doe (Nunley, Daniel)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1945605) by Jane Doe (Nunley, Daniel) Modified on 8/13/2018; this document contains two events and that cannot be properly processed in CM/ECF - see 6 for Motion for Permanent Injunction (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jane Doe (Nunley, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Hunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Kristine L Brown
Represented By: Daniel Clarence Nunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Hunter
Represented By: Michael Kennth Velchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Fallin
Represented By: Michael Kennth Velchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?