Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd.
Defendant: Roy Hartloff, Aaron Cain, Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc. and Roger Hobrock
Case Number: 4:2018cv00413
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
0 Judge: John E Dowdell
1 Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
2 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 46 Featured Case SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
October 2, 2018 45 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: Wrong date entered line 14 (7/9/2018); Correction: Hearing on Dispositive Motions set on 7/9/2019 (Re: #44 Scheduling Order,,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),, ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 25, 2018 44 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2019 at 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Discovery due by 3/29/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2019, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 8/19/2019 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 44 replaced on 10/2/2018 with corrected Document) (kjp, Dpty Clk).
September 24, 2018 43 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Scott, Kellen)
September 14, 2018 42 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/15/2018) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 14, 2018 41 ANSWER (Re: #25 Amended Complaint ) by Roger Hobrock [Note: Attorney Gerald Lee Jackson added to party Roger Hobrock(pty:dft).] (Jackson, Gerald)
September 14, 2018 40 ANSWER (Re: #25 Amended Complaint ) by Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc. (Jackson, Gerald)
September 14, 2018 39 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Unredacted) of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 8/29/2018 before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (Pages: 1-206). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: A party must file a Transcript Redaction Request within 21 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, this unredacted transcript may be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may view the transcript at the court public terminal at no charge or may purchase a copy from the court reporter. (Re: #33 Minutes of Evidentiary Hearing,, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ) (bpn, CrtRptr)
September 4, 2018 38 ANSWER (Re: #25 Amended Complaint ) by Roy Hartloff (Jackson, Gerald)
September 4, 2018 37 ANSWER (Re: #25 Amended Complaint ) by Aaron Cain (Jackson, Gerald)
August 31, 2018 36 NOTICE of Posting of Cash Bond (Re: #35 Order, ) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Ray, Ryan)
August 31, 2018 35 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Preliminary Injunction) (Re: #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 30, 2018 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc. (Jackson, Gerald)
August 30, 2018 33 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/29/2018 ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (With attachments) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 28, 2018 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Roger Hobrock (Re: #25 Amended Complaint ) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Ray, Ryan)
August 28, 2018 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc. (Re: #25 Amended Complaint ) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Ray, Ryan)
August 28, 2018 30 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell The "Motion for Permanent Injunction" referenced in Docket Entry # 3 is stricken as plaintiff simply requests permanent injunctive relief in the style and prayer of its Complaint. The request for a permanent injunction does not constitute a pretrial motion., striking/withdrawing document(s) (Re: 3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (submitted as dkt #2 ) ) (Documents Terminated: 3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (submitted as dkt #2 ) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2018 29 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by Aaron Cain, Roy Hartloff ; (With attachments) (Jackson, Gerald)
August 23, 2018 28 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne ; granting #27 Motion for Protective Order (kah, Chambers)
August 22, 2018 27 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (With attachments) (Scott, Kellen)
August 21, 2018 26 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Roger Hobrock, Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc. (jln, Dpty Clk)
August 20, 2018 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (With attachments) (Scott, Kellen)
August 20, 2018 24 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (smr, Dpty Clk)
August 17, 2018 23 NOTICE of Posting of Cash Bond (Re: #21 Order, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Ray, Ryan)
August 16, 2018 22 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell expediting Defendants' Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction to 8/27/2018; no reply date, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 8/27/2018) (Re: #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Temporary Restraining Order) setting evidentiary hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 8/29/2018 at 9:30 a.m. ; granting #15 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2018 20 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell Movant's motion to quash having been granted [Doc. #19], the alternative motion for protective order [Doc. #18] is now moot. Plaintiff having filed separate motions for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction [Doc. #15 ; finding as moot 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; finding as moot 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot #18 Motion for Protective Order (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2018 19 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell: Motion Hearing held on 8/16/2018 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): Preliminary Injunction ( Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2018 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell); adding attorney Gerald Lee Jackson,Benjamin Neil Schiller for Aaron Cain,Gerald Lee Jackson,Benjamin Neil Schiller for Roy Hartloff ; granting #17 Motion to Quash (Re: #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #17 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Request for Protective Order ) (Court Reporter: Brian Neil) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2018 ***Motion Referral(s) terminated (Re: #18 MOTION for Protective Order (and Motion to Quash Subpoena), #17 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Request for Protective Order ) (see document number [referral to Magistrate terminated]) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 16, 2018 18 MOTION for Protective Order (and Motion to Quash Subpoena) by Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc. (With attachments) (Jackson, Gerald)
August 16, 2018 17 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Request for Protective Order by Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc. [Note: Attorney Gerald Lee Jackson added to party Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc.(pty:mov).] (With attachments) (Jackson, Gerald)
August 16, 2018 16 DECLARATION of Noel Kersh (Re: #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (With attachments) (Ray, Ryan)
August 14, 2018 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (With attachments) (Ray, Ryan)
August 14, 2018 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Roy Hartloff (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Ray, Ryan)
August 14, 2018 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Aaron Cain (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Ray, Ryan)
August 14, 2018 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Ray, Ryan)
August 14, 2018 11 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for Kellen R. Scott and C. Larry Carbo, III ; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 13, 2018 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) C. Larry Carbo III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1947488) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Ray, Ryan)
August 13, 2018 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kellen R. Scott to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1947475) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (Ray, Ryan)
August 10, 2018 8 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting hearing on Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order on August 16, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2018 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (Re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (submitted as dkt #2 ) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 10, 2018 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Judge John E Dowdell. Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 18-CV-413-GKF-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
August 9, 2018 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
August 9, 2018 5 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (srt, Dpty Clk)
August 9, 2018 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Aaron Cain, Roy Hartloff (srt, Dpty Clk)
August 9, 2018 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Permanent Injunction (all submitted as dkt #2 ) by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (srt, Dpty Clk) Modified on 8/28/2018 - STRICKEN per 30 (sac-qc, Dpty Clk).
August 9, 2018 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Aaron Cain, Roy Hartloff by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (srt, Dpty Clk)
August 9, 2018 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. (srt, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd. v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Hartloff
Represented By: Benjamin Neil Schiller
Represented By: Gerald Lee Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Cain
Represented By: Benjamin Neil Schiller
Represented By: Gerald Lee Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Ball Oxygen Co., Inc.
Represented By: Gerald Lee Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Hobrock
Represented By: Gerald Lee Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Welding and Tool Supply, Ltd.
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: Kellen R Scott
Represented By: C Larry Carbo
Represented By: Charles Larry Carbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?