Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC v. Kibby Welding, LLC
Plaintiff: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Defendant: Kibby Welding, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00445
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Claire V Eagan
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/26/2018) (RGG, Chambers)
October 25, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kibby Welding, LLC (Reynolds, Barry)
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC by Kibby Welding, LLC (Reynolds, Barry)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kibby Welding, LLC (Reynolds, Barry)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Kibby Welding, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (dlg, Dpty Clk) Modified on 10/9/2018 to add Minute Order event. (dlg, Dpty Clk).
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Defendant may file its answer or other responsive pleading no later than 10/25/2018 as requested ; Parties are to take notice that documents are being filed in this matter which incorrectly cite the case number. The correct case number, 18-CV-0445-CVE-FHM, should be noted and corrected on all future pleadings.; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/25/2018); granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , #8 Appearance - Attorney, #11 Appearance - Attorney, #10 Appearance - Attorney, #2 Complaint, 6 Minute Order,, Recusing Judge,, Changing Case Number, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jack Miles McFadden on behalf of Kibby Welding, LLC [Note: Attorney Jack Miles McFadden added to party Kibby Welding, LLC(pty:dft).] (McFadden, Jack)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray Thompson Hillis on behalf of Kibby Welding, LLC [Note: Attorney Ray Thompson Hillis added to party Kibby Welding, LLC(pty:dft).] (Hillis, Ray)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kibby Welding, LLC (Reynolds, Barry)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Barry Greg Reynolds on behalf of Kibby Welding, LLC [Note: Attorney Barry Greg Reynolds added to party Kibby Welding, LLC(pty:dft).] (Reynolds, Barry)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kibby Welding, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (Buchan, James)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to a conflict, recusing Judge John E Dowdell. Judge Claire V Eagan reassigned to case., changing case number to 18-CV-445-CVE-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Dpty Clk)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Williams Partners Operating LLC, Corporate Parent The Williams Companies, Inc. for Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC) by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (Buchan, James)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kibby Welding, LLC (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kibby Welding, LLC by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1952465) (Buchan, James) Modified on 8/28/2018 to add filing fee receipt information.(dlg, Dpty Clk).
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (Buchan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC v. Kibby Welding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Mark Alan Hayes, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kibby Welding, LLC
Represented By: Jack Miles McFadden
Represented By: Barry Greg Reynolds
Represented By: Ray Thompson Hillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?