Christensen v. Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC

Plaintiff: Don Christensen
Defendant: Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00511
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief In Support ) by Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC ; (Albert, Victor)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 5/17/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2019, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 9/16/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (a-srt, Dpty Clk)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Don Christensen (Smolen, Daniel)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief In Support ) by Don Christensen ; (With attachments) (Smolen, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief In Support by Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC (With attachments) (Albert, Victor)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Triumph Aerostructures Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Triumph Group Acquisition Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Triumph Group Acquisition Corporation, Other Affiliate Triumph Brands, Inc., Other Affiliate Triumph Group, Inc. for Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC) by Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC (Albert, Victor)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC (Albert, Victor)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lauren C Oldham on behalf of Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC (Oldham, Lauren)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Victor F Albert on behalf of Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC (Albert, Victor)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/5/2018) (lmc, Chambers)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 JURY DEMAND by Don Christensen (Smolen, Daniel)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2018-3688 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1966521) by Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC (With attachments) (Albert, Victor)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC (Albert, Victor)
September 5, 2018 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC by Don Christensen (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Aerostructures-Tulsa, LLC
Represented By: Victor F Albert
Represented By: Lauren C Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Christensen
Represented By: Lauren Grace Lambright
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?